Sublett v. Helton et al

Plaintiff: Damien A. Sublett
Defendant: Keith Helton and Ronda D. May
Case Number: 0:2019cv00004
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #11 Letter re change of address as to Damien A. Sublett (KSS)
February 12, 2019 Clerk's Note: Clerk re-mailed DE #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Sublett at new address in #11 Letter. (KSS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Damien A. Sublett, pro se, with change of address. (Attachments: #1 env PM 2-9-19) (JLS)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Sublett's motion to proceed in forma pauperis DE #5 is GRANTED. 2. The financial docs filed by Sublett indicate he lacks suff income or assets to pay the initial partial filing fee and pymt of such fee is therefore DEFERRED. 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Sublett's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete Form EDKY 525 and serve copy of this order and the form to the Jailer/Warden and upon the Office of General Counsel for the DOC, Frankfort, KY 4. Each month Sublett's custodian shall send the Clerk a pymt in amt equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust acct, but only if the amt in the acct exceeds $10.00 and continue such mthly pymts until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. 5. Sublett must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/11/19. (KSS)cc: COR, Sublett, Warden LSCC, DOC General Counsel w/forms
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Damien Sublett, pro se, requesting copy of docket sheet (Attachments: #1 Env PM 2-6-19) (JLS)cc: Sublett w/copy of docket sheet
February 6, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #7 MOTION for Leave by Damien A. Sublett, #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien A. Sublett (JLS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien A. Sublett, pro se.Motions referred to P SO. (JLS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Supplement Complaint by Damien A. Sublett, pro se.Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Disciplinary Report Form)(JLS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2019: #2 cover ltr, #3 Env, PM 2-4-19 and return address as "Preston Troop") (JLS).
January 31, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien A. Sublett, pro se (KSS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Damien A. Sublett, pro se. (KSS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien A. Sublett, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter & envelope postmarked 1/29/19)(KSS)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : 1) The Clerk shall mark the assigned case number on (a) an affidavit of assets/informa pauperis application (Form AO-240) and (b) a Certificate of Inmate Account (EDKY Form 523) and send to Sublett; 2) Should Sublett wish to pursue this federal action, he must either pay the $350 filing fee and $50 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/Informa Pauperis Application, and (3) file both with the Clerk; 3) Sublett must take these steps within thirty (30) days , or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/28/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Sublett w/appropriate forms via US Mail
January 16, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (JLS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS)
January 16, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO FILING FEE INCLUDED or PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Damien A. Sublett, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Various documents, #2 Env, no PM)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sublett v. Helton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda D. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien A. Sublett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?