Patel et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel and Dhara H. Patel
Defendant: Mike Pompeo and Edward D. Kagan
Case Number: 0:2019cv00035
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plf's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal DE #15 be SUSTAINED and this matter be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/8/19.(KSS)cc: COR
June 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Dhara H. Patel, Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel (JLS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Dhara H. Patel, Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hykel, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted - Acceptance Declined from Consulate General of The United States of America Mumbai, India as to Edward D. Kagan. (KSS)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: the Court hereby SUSTAINS the Motion #4 to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, John J. Hykel shall be granted permission to appear as counsel on behalf of Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/17/19. (KSS)cc: COR, Atty. Hykel (via US Mail)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mike Pompeo via CERTIFIED MAIL to Mike Pompeo served on 4/30/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via CERTIFIED MAIL on 04/30/2019; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via CERTIFIED MAIL on 04/30/2019. (Ahmad, Wael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dhara H. Patel via CERTIFIED MAIL to Edward D. Kagan served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Ahmad, Wael)
May 6, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Wael Ahmad re #10 Summons Returned Executedan incomplete summons was attached. Within 7 calendar days, file the summons issued by the Clerk with the declaration of service completed AND with the certified mail receipt attached which states the method of service, as an electronic attachment to a document entitled Notice of Filing.cc: COR (KSS)
May 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dhara H. Patel (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ahmad, Wael)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Edward D. Kagan, Consul General of the U.S. Consulate, Mumbai, India; Mike Pompeo, U.S. Attorney General; U.S. Attorney. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel for service (KSS)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Dhara H. Patel Summons Edward D. Kagan, Consul General of the U.S. Consulate, Mumbai, India (Ahmad, Wael) Modified on 4/24/2019 (KSS).
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Dhara H. Patel Summons U.S. Attorney Robert Duncan (Ahmad, Wael) Modified on 4/24/2019 (KSS).
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Dhara H. Patel (Ahmad, Wael) Modified on 4/24/2019 (Clerk confirmed with Attorney Ahma that this is a duplicate filing of DE #5 ) (KSS).
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Dhara H. Patel Summons Mike Pompeo, Secretary of State (Ahmad, Wael) Modified on 4/24/2019 (KSS).
April 23, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #4 MOTION for John Hykel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dhara H. Patel, Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4341415) (KSS)
April 23, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John J. Hykel re #4 MOTION for John Hykel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dhara H. Patel, Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4341415). (KSS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for John Hykel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dhara H. Patel, Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4341415) (Ahmad, Wael)
April 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY John J. Hykel by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Returned Attorney Data Form)(KSS)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4332220), filed by Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel, Dhara H. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-I-797 Notice, #3 Exhibit 2-Interview Letter 5/10/18, #4 Exhibit 3-U.S. Consulate General 6/27/18, #5 Exhibit 4-Liberty Law Firm Correspondence 7/3/18, #6 Exhibit 5-Visa Status Check)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward D. Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Vishnubhai Patel
Represented By: Wael M. Ahmad
Represented By: John J. Hykel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dhara H. Patel
Represented By: Wael M. Ahmad
Represented By: John J. Hykel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?