Callahan v. SSA
Plaintiff: Keith Alan Callahan
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 0:2019cv00036
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: 1. Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 90 days; 3. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/13.(JLS)cc: COR
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security)(Morgan, Cheryl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Alan Callahan via USPS to Commissioner of SSA served on 4/22/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via USPS on 4/16/19; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via USPS on 4/22/19. (JLS)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (JLS)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2) The Plaintiff may proceed herein without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/12/19. (JLS)cc: COR
April 12, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Reeves for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith Alan Callahan (JLS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith Alan Callahan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JLS)
April 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Keith Alan Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 ALJ Denial Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #5 Proposed Summons SSA Commissioner, #6 Proposed Summons US Attorney, #7 Proposed USM Receipt and Return)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Alan Callahan
Represented By: William Grover Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?