Cox et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Cox
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00062
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (JLS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION OF REMOVAL filed by Steven Cox, Steven Cox(Individually). (Wheeler, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (JLS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1 Notice of Removal filed by General Motors LLC. (Bird, Melissa)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : 1) within ten days the Deft shall file a memorandum in support of removal; 2) that within seven days thereafter, pla shall file a responsive memorandum; and 3) that in the event the Court determines that it cannot exercise jurisdiction, this action shall be remanded to the Boyd Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 6/28/19.(JLS)cc: COR
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Bird, Melissa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by General Motors LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bird, Melissa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate General Motors Company for General Motors LLC.. (Bird, Melissa)
June 27, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal filed by General Motors LLC (JLS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Melissa Foster Bird. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by General Motors LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS)
June 27, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyd County Circuit Court, Case Number 19-CI-447. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4396587), filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, Complaint and process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cox
Represented By: Daniel Luke Vincent
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?