Evanston Insurance Company v. Compliance Advantage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Compliance Advantage, LLC, CAL Leasing, LLC and Counselor's Clinical Cottage, PSC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00064
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY by Counselor's Clinical Cottage, PSC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USDC Order dated 9/17/18)(Herren, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CAL Leasing, LLC, Compliance Advantage, LLC, Compliance Advantage, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Evanston Insurance Company Notice of Filing Served Summons - CAL Leasing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed/Served Summons - CAL Leasing)(Mando, Jeffrey) Defendant served on 7/10/19 Modified on 7/17/2019 (KSS).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Evanston Insurance Company Notice of Filing Returned/Unexecuted Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Returned/unexecuted summons - CAL Laboratory, #2 Exhibit Returned/unexecuted summons - Compliance Advantage, #3 Exhibit Returned/unexecuted summons - Reliable Lab)(Mando, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Evanston Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons CAL Laboratory, #2 Summons Compliance Advantage, #3 Summons Reliable Lab)(Mando, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Counselor's Clinical Cottage, PSC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Evanston Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mando, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evanston Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company.. (Mando, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jeffrey C. Mando has been filed by Evanston Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAL Leasing, LLC, Compliance Advantage, LLC, Compliance Advantage, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4402613), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint from 5:16-cv-397-DCR, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons CAL Laboratory Services, #5 Summons Compliance Advantage, LLC, #6 Summons CAL Leasing, #7 Summons Reliable Lab)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Compliance Advantage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compliance Advantage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAL Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor's Clinical Cottage, PSC
Represented By: Thomas K. Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Represented By: Jennifer Haddad Langen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?