Carty v. Houchens Food Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ida Mae Carty
Defendant: Houchens Food Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00073
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: (1) NLT 10/14/19 counsel to CONDUCT meeting of parties as required; (2) At time of meeting counsel for parties shall EXCHANGE disclosures; (3) NLT 10/30/19 parties shall FILE written joint report. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/23/19.(KSS)cc: COR
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) NLT 12/1/19 parties FILE motions amend and join addl parties (2) NLT 3/1/20 plf disclose experts (2A) NLT 4/1/20 dft disclose experts (3) NLT 30 days thereafter rebutall (4) NLT 6/1/20 counsel complete discovery (5) NLT 8/1/20 counsel FILE dispositive motions (6) Action assigned for PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on MONDAY, OCTOBER 19, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M. IN ASHLAND; (7) NLT 7 days prior counsel shall FILE items herein (8) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel to pre-mark all exhibits (9) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel shall CONDUCT conference to formulate AGREED proposed jury instructions; (10) At time of PTC, counsel shall FILE electronically with Clerk and submit copy to Court AGREED proposed instructions; (11) At time of PTC, counsel shall FILE with Clerk and SUBMIT a copy to Court and PROVIDE to opposing counsel any objs to use of depos or admissibility of exhibits. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/29/19.(KSS)cc: COR
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Houchens Food Group, Inc..(Edelen, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Edelen, Timothy) Modified on 9/3/2019 to add filers (JLS).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: (1) NLT 8/24/19 counsel for parties to CONDUCT meeting of parties; (2) At time of meeting, parties shall EXCHANGE disclosures; (3) NLT 9/14/19 parties shall FILE written joint report. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/8/19.(KSS)cc: COR
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Houchens Food Group, Inc..(Edelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the #1 Removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/2/19.(KSS)cc: COR
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Houchens Food Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Houchens Food Group, Inc. for Houchens Food Group, Inc... (Edelen, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Timothy L. Edelen. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Houchens Food Group, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS)
August 1, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rowan Circuit Court, Case No. 19-CI-90100 ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4425930), filed by Houchens Food Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carty v. Houchens Food Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Mae Carty
Represented By: Anthony J. Bucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houchens Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?