Nickerson v. Streeval
Petitioner: Daryl Andra Nickerson
Respondent: Jason C. Streeval
Case Number: 0:2019cv00080
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. The Respondent's motion for an extension of time DE #7 is GRANTED. 2. The Respondent shall file his response to Nickerson's petition by no later than Friday, November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/11/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Nickerson (via US mail)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jason C. Streeval to respond to petitioner's writ of habeas corpus [DE 1]. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melloan, Kyle)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason C. Streeval. (Melloan, Kyle)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Warden, FCI Ashland, U.S. Attorney, re #4 Order(KSS)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED 1. Clerk of Court shall send copy of petition and this Order by certified mail to both (a) Respondent Streeval, Warden (b) US Atty for EDKY. 2. Within 60 days from EOO, Respondent shall file a response to the petition. The response shall be in the form of a memorandum addressing the factual allegations and legal claims contained in the petition; neither a formal motion to dismiss nor a motion for summary judgment is necessary or appropriate for these proceedings. The Respondent shall also attach any documentary evidence relevant to his response or Nickerson's claims generally. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/16/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Nickerson (via US Mail), Warden, US Atty (Via Certified Mail)
August 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (JLS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS)
August 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0002937.), filed by Daryl Andra Nickerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Receipt, #3 env, no pm)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickerson v. Streeval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daryl Andra Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason C. Streeval
Represented By: Kyle M. Melloan, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?