Ferguson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Donna Ferguson
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00084
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Joseph M Hood
2 Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1) The parties' #9 Motion to Stay discovery and pretrial deadlines is GRANTED; 2) The parties SHALL file a joint status report on the status of the action nlt Tuesday, January 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/30/19. (JLS)cc: COR
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter be REASSIGNED to the Honorable United States District Judge Joseph M. Hood for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/29/19.(KSS)cc: COR
October 28, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #9 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C.R. Bard, Inc. (JLS)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Melissa) Modified on 10/28/2019 to add filer (JLS).
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C.R. Bard, Inc. of Substitution of Counsel (Bird, Melissa)
September 10, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2445-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15797436 filed by Donna Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ferguson
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Represented By: William Rivera Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?