Lewis v. Perkins et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Scott Lewis
Defendant: James Skaggs, John R. Stamper, Thomas Perkins, Kevin McDavid, Cody Stamper, Any Unknown Defendants Not Known At This Time, John Stamper, Roy Ison and Michael Shane Perkins
Case Number: 0:2019cv00099
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Roy Ison(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police Department), Roy Ison(Inidividually), Kevin McDavid(In His Official Capacity as Chief with the Grayson Police Department), Kevin McDavid(Individually), Thomas Perkins(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police Department), Thomas Perkins(Individually).(Graham, Curt)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Daniel Scott Lewis. Filed pursuant to Order #9 (KSS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to the Motion of Plaintiff #7 for Leave to file an Amended Complaint and with good cause shown, the court hereby GRANTS the Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and the attached Amended Complaint shall be filed herein. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/3/19. (KSS)cc: COR
November 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #7 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct by Daniel Scott Lewis Amend Complaint (JLS)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Michael Shane Perkins(Individually), Michael Shane Perkins(In his Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), Thomas Perkins(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police D filed by Daniel Scott Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Joy, Sebastian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct by Daniel Scott Lewis Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Complaint)(Joy, Sebastian)
November 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: order for meeting and report. (JLS)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Roy Ison(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police Department), Roy Ison(Inidividually), Kevin McDavid(In His Official Capacity as Chief with the Grayson Police Department), Kevin McDavid(Individually), Thomas Perkins(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police Department), Thomas Perkins(Individually).(Graham, Curt)
November 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Michael Shane Perkins(Individually), Michael Shane Perkins(In his Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), Thomas Perkins(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police D (KSS)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Michael Shane Perkins(Individually), Michael Shane Perkins(In his Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), James Skaggs(Individually), James Skaggs(In His Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), Cody Stamper(Individually), Cody Stamper(In His Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), John Stamper(In His offical Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), John R. Stamper(Individually), John Stamper(Individually), John R. Stamper(In his Offical Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Renfroe, Robert) Modified text on 11/1/2019 (JJ).
October 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Sebastian M. Joy re #4 Summons Returned Executed. Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Summons. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments.Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (KSS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Scott Lewis via hand delivery to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons James Skaggs, #2 Summons John R. Stamper, #3 Summons John Stamper, #4 Summons chief Kevin "Mooch" McDavid, #5 Summons Michael Shane Perkins, #6 Summons Officer Roy Ison, #7 Summons Officer Thomas Perkins )(Joy, Sebastian) Modified on 10/22/2019 to describe attachments (KSS).
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Roy Ison(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police Department), Roy Ison(Inidividually), Kevin McDavid(In His Official Capacity as Chief with the Grayson Police Department), Kevin McDavid(Individually), Michael Shane Perkins(Individually), Michael Shane Perkins(In his Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), Thomas Perkins(In His Official Capacity as Officer with the Grayson Police Department), Thomas Perkins(Individually), James Skaggs(Individually), James Skaggs(In His Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), Cody Stamper(Individually), Cody Stamper(In His Official Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), John Stamper(In His offical Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction), John R. Stamper(Individually), John Stamper(Individually), John R. Stamper(In his Offical Capacity at Stampers Concrete and Construction); Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS)
October 9, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4487911), filed by Daniel Scott Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Thomas Perkins, #2 Summons for Kevin "Mooch" McDavid, #3 Summons for Roy Ison, #4 Summons for Cody Stamper, #5 Summons for John Stamper, #6 Summons for John R. Stamper, #7 Summons Michael Shane Perkins, #8 Summons for James Skaggs, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Perkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Skaggs
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Stamper
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Perkins
Represented By: Curt Matthew Graham
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McDavid
Represented By: Curt Matthew Graham
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Stamper
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Defendants Not Known At This Time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stamper
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Ison
Represented By: Curt Matthew Graham
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shane Perkins
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Scott Lewis
Represented By: Sebastian M. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?