Hay Mineral Resources, LLC v. Collingwood USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hay Mineral Resources, LLC
Defendant: Collingwood USA, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00120
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER This matter be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the docket of the Court. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/9/20.(JLS)cc: COR
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hay Mineral Resources, LLC (Norman, Medrith)
December 30, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (JLS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER: 1) the #7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to file Responsive Pleading is GRANTED; 2) Deft Collingwood USA, Inc. shall have until either Feb 20, 2020 or 10 days after the entry of an order resolving the pending Motion to Remand in Collingwood USA, Inc. v. Hay Mineral Resources, LLC and Pathhead Capital, Inc. , to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/3/19.(JLS)cc: COR
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Collingwood USA, Inc. or to file Responsive Pleading (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Hieneman, Keri)
December 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to file Responsive Pleading by Collingwood USA, Inc. (KSS)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Collingwood USA, Inc. regarding numbering of state court action. (Hieneman, Keri)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Collingwood USA, Inc. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/20/19.(JLS)cc: COR
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Collingwood USA, Inc.. (Latherow, Leigh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Leigh Gross Latherow. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Collingwood USA, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Elliott County Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-115. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4521695), filed by Collingwood USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLS)
November 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
November 14, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hay Mineral Resources, LLC v. Collingwood USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collingwood USA, Inc.
Represented By: Keri Ellen Hieneman
Represented By: Bradley S. Fyffe
Represented By: Leigh Gross Latherow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hay Mineral Resources, LLC
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?