Hale v. Carter Co. Sheriff's Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Derrick K. Hale
Defendant: Timothy Jackson, Carter Co. City Police, Eric Ross, Chase Steel and Carter Co. Sheriff's Dept.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00022
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER 20-03 - COURT OPERATIONS RELATED TO COVID-19: 1. General Order does not apply to ongoing trials; 2. Continuation of civil & criminal trials per General Order 20-03 extended to civil & criminal trials set to begin 5/1/2020. 3. hearings in criminal cases through 5/1/2020, motion hearings, change of plea, & sentencings CONTINUED GENERALLY, subject to further orders. 4. Initial appearances & detention hearings proceed via remote attendance to extent possible; appearances by summons cont. after 5/1/20. 5. Except TROs, prel. inj., & emergency matters, in-person hrgs in civil cases through 5/1/2020 CONTINUED GENERALLY. Assigned judge may proceed by means not requiring personal appearance. 6. Absent exceptional circumstances, hrgs in emergency matters shall be conducted by means not requiring in-person attendance. 7. If a detention facility informs USM inmate is ill, inmate shall not be brought to Courthouse. 8. Naturalization ceremonies through 5/1/2020 are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 9. Settlement conferences through 5/1/2020 are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 10. Misd. & petty offense dockets through 5/1/2020 CONTINUED GENERALLY. 11. For complaints filed per False Claims Act, which remain under seal, US granted add'l 60 days to intervene or notify Court that it declines. 12. Courts remain open. Eff. 3/24/2020-5/1/2020 Courthouse open Mon-Fri 10 AM-2 PM. 13. Visitor restrictions apply & will be screened. 14. Gen. Order 20-02 remains in effect. 15. Court may issue further directives. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/23/20.(JLS)cc: CORand Derrick K. Hale by US Mail
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Timothy Jackson, Eric Ross,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (KSS)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Hale's claims against (1) the Carter County Sheriff's Department (2) the Carter County City Police; (3) Timothy Jackson in his official capacity; (4) Eric Ross in his official capacity; and (5) Chase Steel in his individual and official capacities are DISMISSED. 2. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare "Service Packets" for defendants Timothy Jackson and Eric Ross, each in their individual capacities. Each Service Packet shall include: a. completed summons for b. the Complaint c. this Order and d. a completed USM Form 285 3. The Deputy Clerk shall deliver the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 4. The USMS shall make arrangements with the appropriate officials at the Carter County Sheriff's Office to personally serve officers Timothy Jackson and Eric Ross with Service Packets at Carter County Sheriff's Office. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/3/20.(KSS)cc: CORand Derrick K. hale by US Mail
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Hale's motion to proceed in forma pauperis R. #7 is GRANTED. 2. Because Hale has been granted pauper status, the $50 admin fee is waived. District Court Misc Fee Schedule 14 Title 28, Section 1915(b)(1),(2) require a prisoner to pay the $350 filing fee as set forth below. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an acct in Hale's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form EDKY 525 and send the Notice and a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution in which Hale is confined. 4. Within 28 days, Hale's custodian shall deduct $28.80 from Hale's inmate acct and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 5. For each month thereafter, if the amount in Hale's inmate acct exceeds $10.00, his custodian shall deduct from Hale's inmate acct an amt equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court. The custodian shall continue such mthly pymts until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/3/20. (KSS)cc: CORand Derrick K. Hale by US Mail
March 26, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick K. Hale, pro se (KSS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Derrick K. Hale. (KSS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick K. Hale, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail envelope)(KSS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derrick K. Hale with envelope postmarked 3/20/20 (KSS)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1) Hale's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; 2) The clerk shall mark the assigned case number on an affidavit of assets/ifp application (Form AO-240) and a Certificate of Inmate Account (Form 523) and send them to Hale; 3) Within 28 days, Hale must either pay the $350 filing fee and $50 service fee, or complete and file both these forms. If he fails to do so, the court will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/3/20. (JLS)cc: CORand Derrick K. Hale, with appropriate forms, by US Mail
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLS)
March 2, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick K. Hale, pro se. (JLS)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick K. Hale Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Inmate acct stmt)(JLS)
March 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2 summons(es) presented referred to Judge PSO, filed by Derrick K. Hale, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 env, no pm)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Carter Co. Sheriff's Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Co. City Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Co. Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick K. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?