Perkins v. Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jodi M. Perkins
Defendant: Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00103
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURES by Jodi M. Perkins.(Wilhoit, William)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A) 1) Rule 26 disclosures on or before 9/23/20. These should not be filed into the record. 2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings on or before 1/8/21. 3) Rule 26 Experts from pla 5/10/21; Deft 6/10/21. These should not be filed into the record. Supplementation will be made in conjunction with Rule 26. 4) Fact Discovery - 4/8/21; 5) Expert Discovery 9/10/21; 6) Status Report 9/10/21. Report should indicate the progress of the negotiations, likelihood of settlement and feasibility of alternative dispute resolution; 7) Dispositive or Daubert Motions 11/12/21; 8) Copies of Memoranda courtesy copy must be provided to chambers w/i 48 hours of filing and should be in paper form or emailed to bunning_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. B) REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND PRE-TRIAL DISCOVERY PROCEDURES: 1) this case is referred to Mag. Judge Edward B. Atkins to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings as set out herein; 2) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (a) parties meet and attempt to resolve disputes; (b) if unable to resolve, they shall attempt telephonic conference with Magistrate Judge; (c) if, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their disputes they may file appropriate written motions with the Court and shall include the certification required by local rule. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/17/20.(JLS)cc: COR
September 16, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JLS)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schneider, Craig) Modified on 9/16/2020 to add filers (JLS).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) W/I 21 days the parties shall meet to discuss claims, defenses, possibility of settlement and discovery plan; 2) W/I 10 days from meeting parties file joint status report (a) the proposed discovery plan; (b) estimated time for pretrial motions; (c) suitability for some for of alternative dispute resolution; (d) estimated probable length of trial; (e) consent to jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, each shall file individual report which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(JLS)cc: COR
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc.. (Schneider, Craig)
August 26, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: #4 Order Reassigning Case (KSS)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the above-styled action is hereby REASSIGNED to the Honorable David L. Bunning for all further proceedings. Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/26/20.(KSS)cc: COR
August 26, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal (KSS)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Craig Schneider. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS)
August 26, 2020 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc. (NOTE: State Court Pleading see DE #1 for pdf document)(KSS)
August 26, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc., filed by Jodi M. Perkins. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document)(KSS)
August 26, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyd Circuit Court, Case No. 20-CI-402. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4757926), filed by Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Defs Answer to Plfs Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Plfs Responses to Defs Req Admissions, #4 Exhibit 4-Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit 5-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi M. Perkins
Represented By: Laura Jane Phelps
Represented By: William H. Wilhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmas Conley Trucking of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Craig M. Schneider
Represented By: Judd R. Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?