Cox et al v. Ruckel et al
Plaintiff: Guy Meade and Carrie Cox
Defendant: Terri Thomas, Amy Kennedy, Jonathan Shane Wallingford, Russell Malone, Dianna Malone and Anthony Todd Ruckel
Case Number: 0:2020cv00120
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Dianna and Russell Malone's Motion for Attorney's Fees DE #25 be OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/24/21. (KSS)cc: COR
March 23, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #25 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone (KSS)
March 11, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone filed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade. (Wiest, Christopher)
February 23, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Colby Cowherd re #24 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone. Error: Attorney filed duplicate motion entries; Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk modified the text of #24 to indicate it was incorrectly filed, termed the incorrectly filed motion; In the future, do not re-file the entire document. Instead, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the omitted documents, and create a link to the related docket entry. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KSS)
February 22, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Attachment, #4 Proposed Order)(Cowherd, Colby)
February 22, 2021 Filing 24 Incorrectly Filed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Attachment)(Cowherd, Colby) Modified on 2/23/2021 to reflect this was incorrectly filed by attorney (no proposed order attached) See DE #25 for correct entry (KSS).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1) Deft Wallingford's #14 Motion to Dismiss is SUSTAINED; 2) Defts Dianna and Russell Malone's #18 Motion to Dismiss is SUSTAINAED; 3) All claims against these Defts be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This is an INTERLOCTORY and NON-APPEALABLE Order. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/8/21. (JLS)cc: COR
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone in lieu of Answer filed by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone. (Cowherd, Colby)
November 24, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF to #19 In support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jonathan Shane Wallingford. (McIntyre, M.)
November 12, 2020 ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jonathan Shane Wallingford; #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone in lieu of Answer, (KSS)
November 10, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone in lieu of Answer filed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 10, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jonathan Shane Wallingford filed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Dianna Malone, Russell Malone in lieu of Answer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order)(Cowherd, Colby)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 SEPARATE ANSWER of Amy Kennedy to #1 Complaint. Re-filed from 2:20-cv-141 pursuant to QC procedures. (SKV)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 SEPARATE ANSWER of Terri Thomas to #1 Complaint. Re-filed from 2:20-cv-141 pursuant to QC Procedures. (SKV)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 SEPARATE ANSWER of Anthony Todd Ruckel to #1 Complaint. Re-filed from case 2:20-cv-141 pursuant to QC Procedures. (SKV)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jonathan Shane Wallingford (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(McIntyre, M.)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Shane Wallingford. (McIntyre, M.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade via Certified mail, RRR to Amy Kennedy served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade via Certified mail, RRR to Russell Malone served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade via Certified mail, RRR to Dianna Malone served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade via Certified mail, RRR to Jonathan Shane Wallingford served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade via Certified mail, RRR to Terri Thomas served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade via Certified mail, RRR to Anthony Todd Ruckel served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to LR 3.2(a)(1), this matter is hereby transferred to the Northern Division at Ashland. The case be assigned to an Ashland Judge upon transfer. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/08/2020.(SLG)cc: COR
October 8, 2020 Clerk's Note: re #5 Order. This case is hereby transferred from the Northern Division of Covington, 2:20-cv-141. ALL FURTHER FILINGS SHALL BE FILED IN THIS CASE, 0:20-CV-120. (SLG)
October 8, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #5 Order transferring case to Ashland Division (KSS)
October 8, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLG)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TJZ)cc: COR
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (TJZ)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4791859), filed by Carrie Cox, Guy Meade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(TJZ)
October 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Ruckel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Meade
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Cox
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Thomas
Represented By: Phillip Bruce Leslie
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Kennedy
Represented By: Phillip Bruce Leslie
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Shane Wallingford
Represented By: M. Scott McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Malone
Represented By: Colby B. Cowherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Malone
Represented By: Colby B. Cowherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Todd Ruckel
Represented By: Phillip Bruce Leslie
Represented By: Robert Timothy Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?