Hafner et al v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Hafner
Defendant: Lt. Chandler, Deputy Enyart, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Deputy Johnson, Sgt. Travis Hanshaw, Lt. Guzman, Nurse Mike, Karen Baker, Nurse Susan, Deputy Gross, Nurse Trish and Nurse Andy
Case Number: 0:2021cv00032
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from William D. Hensley, Boyd County Jailer, advising the Court of Christopher J. Hafner's passing. (Attachments: #1 DLB Order dated 4/14/21 sent to BCDC, #2 env, pm 4-20-21) (JLS)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #13 Letter (JLS)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) Hafner's motions to proceed in forma pauperis DE #8 #10 are GRANTED; (2) Because Hafner has been granted pauper status in this proceeding, the $52.00 administrative fee is waived. District Court Misc. Fee Schedule 14 Title 28, Section 1915(b)(1), (2) require a prisoner to pay the $350.00 filing fee as setforth below; (3) The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Hafner's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a form EDKY 525 and shall send the Notice and a copy of this Order to the Warden of the institution in which Hafner is confined; (4) Collection of the initial partial filing fee is DEFERRED; (5) For each month thereafter, if the amount in Hafner's inmate account exceeds $10.00, his custodian shall deduct from Hafner's inmate account an amount equal to 20% of his income of the preceding month and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court. The custodian shall continue such mthly payments until the entire $350 filing fee is paid; (6) This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 4/14/21. (KSS)cc: CORand Warden w/form, Hafner by US Mail
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher J. Hafner. (KSS)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher J. Hafner, with envelope postmarked 4/9/21.Motions referred to P SO. (KSS)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher J. Hafner, pro se. Received in envelope with supplemental complaint (KSS)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher J. Hafner, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Received in envelope with supplemental complaint)(KSS)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT by Christopher J. Hafner, pro se, re #1 Complaint (Referred). Clerk's note: Envelope has return address as Boyd County Detention Center, P.O. Box 3022, Durham, NC 27702 (Attachments: #1 Envelope - no postmark)(KSS)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) Hafner's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; (2) The Clerk of the Court shall mark the assigned case number on an affidavit of assets/in forma pauperis application (Form AO-240) and a Certificate of Inmate Account (EDKY Form 523) and send them to Hafner; and (3) Within 28 days Hafner must pay the $350 filing fee and the $52 administrative fee, or complete and file each of these provided forms. If he fails to do so, the Court will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 3/24/21. (KSS)cc: CORand Hafner by US Mail w/forms
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher J. Hafner, pro se. (KSS)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KSS)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher J. Hafner. (KSS)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher J. Hafner, pro seMotions referred to P SO. (KSS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/23/2021) (KSS).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge PSO, filed by Christopher J. Hafner, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KSS) Modified on 3/23/2021 to reflect that envelope was from SSA; Documents were received in the SSA office and returned to Hafner and then returned to USDC on this date (KSS).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher J. Hafner, pro se (KSS)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hafner et al v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Enyart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Travis Hanshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Trish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Andy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Hafner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?