Brien v. North American Refractories Company et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Brien
Defendant: North American Refractories Company, Harbison-Walker International and Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 0:2021cv00034
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) NLT 7/1/21, parties to file any motions to amend pleadings or join parties; (2) NLT 8/1/21 all discovery, if any, shall be completed; (3) NLT 9/1/21, both parties file dispositive motions with supporting memoranda; (4) On or before 10/1/21, parties shall file responsive memoranda; (5) That if a party chooses to file a reply, the memorandum must be filed by NLT 10/15/21, at which time this matter shall stand submitted to the Court for review Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/6/21.(KSS)cc: COR
May 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Tracy Frye. #13 Answer to Complaint has been filed by North American Refractories Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by North American Refractories Company.(Frye, Tracy)
April 27, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #12 Status Report (JLS)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT (Joint Written Report) by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy D. Frye on behalf of North American Refractories Company (Frye, Tracy)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1) NLT 4/30/21 the parties shall file a written joint report; 2) Upon receipt of the report, this matter will be placed on schedule. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 4/6/21.(JLS)cc: COR
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER the #1 Removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 4/6/21.(JLS)cc: COR
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) the #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; 2) Iwana Rademaekers is ADMITTED phv for Deft.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 4/6/21. (JLS)cc: COR
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance.. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Mutual Insurance ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4929457) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Iwana Rademaekers. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS)
March 25, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
March 25, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Iwana Rademaekers re #5 MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Mutual Insurance ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4929457). (KSS)
March 25, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal (KSS)
March 25, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #5 MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Mutual Insurance ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4929457) (KSS)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 HARBISON WALKER INTERNATIONAL'S CONSENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Refractories Company. Attached to #1 Notice of Removal but styled for this Court (KSS)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenup Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-34. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4928708), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brien v. North American Refractories Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Refractories Company
Represented By: Tracy D. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbison-Walker International
Represented By: Tracy D. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Brien
Represented By: James W. Lyon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?