Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund et al v. KLM Electric, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund and Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund
Defendant: KLM Electric, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00055
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund cc: COR (JLS)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund re #4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund (Attachments: #1 Attachment Entry of Default)(Dunn, Rex)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund. Amendment to #4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund Proof of Service. (Dunn, Rex)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rex Dunn)(Dunn, Rex)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KLM Electric, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically.(JLS)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4988410), filed by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund, Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Letter of Assent, #2 Exhibit A-2 Inside Agreement, #3 Exhibit B 4th District Restatement, #4 Exhibit C Collection Policy, #5 Exhibit D 317 PN Delinquency, #6 Exhibit E 317 VA Delinquency Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons for KLM Electric, LLC)(JLS)
June 7, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund et al v. KLM Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Pension Fund
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the IBEW Local 317 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLM Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?