Young v. SSA
Plaintiff: Donna Leigh Young
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 0:2022cv00023
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Leigh Young via USPS to Commissioner of SSA served on 3/28/2022. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via USPS on 3/28/22; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via USPS on 3/28/22. (JLS)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (JLS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2022: #1 receipt) (JLS).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/25/22. (JLS)cc: COR
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING Proposed Summons filed by Donna Leigh Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons to US Attorney, #3 USM-285, #4 USM-285)(Hicks, Henry) Modified on 3/24/2022 to properly identify documents (JLS).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Leigh Young. (JLS)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Donna Leigh Young.(JLS) Modified on 3/24/2022 to reflect that the clerk confirmed with attorney Hicks that the address listed on the docket sheet is in fact the correct address, not the address on the actual filing (JLS).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JLS)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of VanTatenhove for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Leigh Young. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Leigh Young
Represented By: Henry David Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?