McDaniel et al v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Nancy McDaniel and Jeremy Bevins
Defendant: Melinda Davis, Lee E. Giddens, Anders Williams Trucking Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2022cv00080
Filed: October 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING Supplemental Disclosures by Anders Williams Trucking Company, Lee E. Giddens (Edwards, Blake) Modified on 11/28/2022 to further describe document (JLS).
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Disclosures by Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Gudalis, Brian) Modified on 11/16/2022 to adequately describe document (JLS).
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Melinda Davis (Cetrulo, Robert)
November 16, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Edward B. Atkins for review: re #8 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Crossclaim and Third Party Complaint by Lee E. Giddens Defendant (KSS)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Anders Williams Trucking Company, Lee E. Giddens (Edwards, Blake)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Crossclaim and Third-Party Complaint by Lee E. Giddens Defendant Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cross Claim and Third-Party Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave)(Hiestand, Sheila) Modified on 11/16/2022 to further describe (KSS).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) NLT 12/4/22 Rule 26 disclosures exchanged (not filed); 2) NLT 3/1/23 Motions to Join Parties or Amend Pleadings; 3) Rule 26 expert disclosures and reports: for Pla NLT 5/1/23, for Defts NLT 6/1/23, rebuttal NLT 7/1/23; 4) Close of Discovery NLT 11/1/23; 5) Status Report NLT 12/1/23; 6) Final witness and exhibit list NLT 2/15/24; 7) Dispositive and Daubert motions NLT 2/15/24; 8) Copies of Memoranda to be provided to Chambers w/i 48 hours of filing to bunning_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/14/2022.(JLS)cc: COR
November 2, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: #6 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KSS)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Edwards, Blake)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) W/I 21 days the parties to meet and discuss discovery and resolution plans; 2) w/i 10 days thereafter the parties shall file a joint status report; 3) should a joint report not be possible, the parties shall file individual reports. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/13/22. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(JLS)cc: COR
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anders Williams Trucking Company. (JLS)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER : 1) This matter be referred to the US Magistrate Judge in Ashland to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2) the Matistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved as set out herein. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/15/22.(JLS)cc: COR
October 11, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Anders Williams Trucking Company, attached as part of the State Court Record at DE #1 .(JLS)
October 11, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint by Lee E. Giddens, filed as part of the State Court Record at DE #1 .(JLS)
October 11, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
October 11, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Melinda Davis, filed as part of the State Court Record at DE #1 .(JLS)
October 11, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal. (JLS)
October 11, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, filed as part of the State Court Record at DE #1 .(JLS)
October 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lewis County Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-00-127. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5383106), filed by Lee E. Giddens, Anders Williams Trucking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Partial State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2: Gidden's Drivers License, #3 Exhibit 3: NC Secretary of State Filing, #4 Exhibit 4: Police Report, #5 Exhibit 5: Ky Dept of Insurance Filing, #6 Exhibit 6: Additional State Court Record - Answers, #7 Exhibit 7: Davis' Consent to Remove, #8 Exhibit 8: Twin City's Consent to Remove, #9 Exhibit 9: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit 10: Certificate of Filing, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel et al v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McDaniel
Represented By: Adrian M. Mendiondo
Represented By: John F. Estill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bevins
Represented By: Adrian M. Mendiondo
Represented By: John F. Estill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Davis
Represented By: Robert B. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee E. Giddens
Represented By: Blake Van Edwards
Represented By: Daniel I. Wenig
Represented By: Sheila Patricia Hiestand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anders Williams Trucking Company
Represented By: Blake Van Edwards
Represented By: Daniel I. Wenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Michael Gudalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?