Hensyn Resources, LLC v. Horizon Mining, LLC
Plaintiff: Hensyn Resources, LLC
Defendant: Horizon Mining, LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv00085
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Kentucky Secretary of State re #5 Summons Issued. (KSS)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hensyn Resources, LLC. (Wilhoit, William)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William H. Wilhoit. #1 Complaint has been filed by Hensyn Resources, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Horizon Mining, LLC; Summons issued and returned with service packet to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Secretary of State. (JLS)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Hensyn Resources, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wilhoit, William)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER : 1) This matter be referred to the US Magistrate Judge in Ashland to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2) the Matistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved as set out herein. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/15/22.(JLS)cc: COR
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5390197), filed by Hensyn Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Executed Contract, #2 Exhibit 2: Gmail from Tom Mills, #3 Exhibit 3: WLO to Horizon not of default)(JLS)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JLS)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO William H. Wilhoit re #1 Complaint; attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned via US Mail to the Secretary of state; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 22-99999. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance onpaper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with theprepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensyn Resources, LLC v. Horizon Mining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hensyn Resources, LLC
Represented By: Laura Jane Phelps
Represented By: William H. Wilhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Mining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?