Colony National Insurance Company v. Sorenson Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Colony National Insurance Company
Defendant: Sorenson Medical, Inc., SMI Liquidating, Inc., Sorenson Development, Inc. and Sorenson Medical Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00074
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Covington Office
Presiding Judge: David L. Bunning
Presiding Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on defendants' counterclaims for bad faith 124 is GRANTED. A separate judgment shall enter in due course. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/30/2015.(TJZ)cc: COR
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that Sorenson's motion for leave to file supplemental counterclaims against Colony National 87 is GRANTED. The supplemental counterclaims tendered with that motion [87-1] be and are hereby DEEMED FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 07/25/2013.(TED)cc: COR
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Defts' motion for summary judgment 27 and pltf's motions for partial summary judgment 28 29 be, and are hereby, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, consistent with the above opinion. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 12/21/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony National Insurance Company v. Sorenson Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony National Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Roger Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorenson Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMI Liquidating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorenson Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorenson Medical Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?