Williams v. Fletcher et al
Plaintiff: Rodger Williams
Defendant: Sgt. Stokes, Officer John Doe #2, Lieutenant Fletcher, Officer John Doe #1, John Does and James Daley
Case Number: 2:2018cv00122
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Covington Office
County: Campbell
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT; 1)Plaintiff Rodger Williams' #1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2)Judgment is ENTERED in favor of the defendants; 3)This is a Final and Appealable Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/19/2018.(LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Pla via U.S. Mail
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; (1) The Clerk of the Court shall ADD James Daley, Jailer of the Campbell County Detention Center, as a defendant in this action, solely in his official capacity; (2) Williamss complaint (Doc. # 3) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (3) Williamss #5 motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED AS MOOT; (4) The Court will enter an appropriate JUDGMENT contemporaneously with this Order; and (5) This matter is STRICKEN from the active docket of the Court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/19/2018. (LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Pla via U.S. Mail
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER; (1) Williamss #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED;(2) Because Williams has been granted pauper status in this proceeding, the$50.00 administrative fee is waived. District Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, 14 Section 1915(b)(1) requires a prisoner-plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee for a civil action as set forth below; (3) In light of Williamss substantial negative balance in her inmate account, the collection of the initial partial filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A) isDEFERRED; (4) The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Williamss name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) and shall serve a copy of the Notice and this Order upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Williams is currently confined; and (5) Each month Williamss custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court apayment in an amount equal to twenty (20) percent of her income for the preceding month out of her inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds ten (10) dollars. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00filing fee is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2).. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/17/2018. (LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Pla via U.S. Mail, Jailer/Warden w/EDKY 525 via U.S. Mail
July 16, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Rodger Williams, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodger Williams (LST)
July 16, 2018 Conflict Check run. (LST)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(LST)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by Rodger Williams, Pro SEMotions referred to P SO. (LST)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Rodger Williams, Pro SE (Attachments: #1 USM Forms, #2 Envelope Post Marked 7-13-18)(LST)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rodger Williams. (LST)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodger Williams Motions referred to P SO, Pro SE(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Fletcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodger Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?