Howarth v. Living Studios Properties 264 Pike LLC et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Defendant: Living Studios Properties 264 Pike LLC, Collin Rowland and Augur Metal Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00178
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #7 MOTION for David C. Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Morgan Howarth, the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/09/2018. (KRB)cc: COR
November 8, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: #7 MOTION for David C. Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan Howarth ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4203911), #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Bar Status Check completed, #9 Notice (KRB)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Morgan Howarth re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Deal, Esq.)(Francis, James)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: that the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 is hereby taken under advisement, pending counsel filing by not later than November 13, 2018, a Notice with the required additional disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/1/2018. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Attorney David C. Deal.
November 1, 2018 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David C. Deal re #7 MOTION for David C. Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan Howarth ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4203911). (KRB)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for David C. Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan Howarth ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4203911)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Deal, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY David C. Deal by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Admission Info and Routing Form - No record)(ECO)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (ECO)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Augur Metal Products, Inc., Living Studios Properties 264 Pike LLC, Collin Rowland; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4188923), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Infringed image, #2 Exhibit 2-Copyright registration, #3 Exhibit 3-Image from Plaintiff's website, #4 Exhibit 4-Image of Defenant's artwork digitally inserted into Plaintiff's photograph, #5 Exhibit 5-Publication of altered image on www.glowgallery.org/services, #6 Exhibit 6-Publication of altered image on www.shopify.com, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to Augur Metal, #9 Summons to Living Studios, #10 Summons to Rowland)(ECO)
October 11, 2018 Conflict Check run. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howarth v. Living Studios Properties 264 Pike LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Studios Properties 264 Pike LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augur Metal Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Represented By: David C. Deal
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?