Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Dickey Excavating, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Dickey Excavating, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00195
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: that Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint #9 is hereby granted. Defendant shall have up to and including February 25, 2019, within which to answer, move, or otherwise plead in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 01/25/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
January 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dickey Excavating, Inc. (LST)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dickey Excavating, Inc. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Scott)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Dickey Excavating, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Kennedy, Katherine)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Kennedy, Katherine)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Katherine)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Katherine Kennedy. #1 Complaint has been filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
November 27, 2018 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Dickey Excavating, Inc., filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (ECO)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4222668), filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Dickey Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickey Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Rowland Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?