Antony v. Disney Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: John Antony
Defendant: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00205
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Disney Enterprises, Inc. and Improper Venue, and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kathleen Fong Yoneda, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael T. Salama, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Gill Champion, #5 Exhibit D - Form 10-K, #6 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert). Modified to remove referral on 2/14/2019 (LST).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER; 1. DEI shall file any motion directed to venue or jurisdiction by February 13, 2019, and shall file any motion for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by February 20, 2019. Plaintiffs time for filing responses and DEI's time for filing replies shall be governed by LR 7.1 ( c ), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/4/2019.(LST)cc: COR
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Order by Disney Enterprises, Inc. Unopposed Motion for a Briefing Schedule Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #10 Motion for Michael A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Antony, the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 01/25/2019. (KRB)cc: COR
January 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: #19 Notice of Filing, (LST)
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING by John Antony re #10 MOTION for MICHAEL A. ROBERTS to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Antony ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4262621), #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR ADMISSION (Cole, Stacy)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #13 MOTION for Usha Chilukuri Vance to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Disney Enterprises, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/23/2019. (LST)cc: COR, w/ECF Registration form to Usha Chilukuri Vance
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #12 MOTION for Erin Joan Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Disney Enterprises, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/23/2019. (LST)cc: COR, w/ECF Registration Form to Erin Joan Cox
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #11 MOTION for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Disney Enterprises, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/23/2019. (LST)cc: COR, w/ECF Registration form to Glenn D. Pomerantz
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER; 1. The #10 Motion for Attorney Michael A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice is taken under advisement, pending counsel filing by not later than February 1, 2019, a supplement providing the necessary additional information.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/23/2019. (LST)cc: COR
January 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #13 MOTION for Usha Chilukuri Vance to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264485), #12 MOTION for Erin Joan Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264474), #11 MOTION for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264444) (LST)
January 22, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Glenn D. Pomerantz, Erin Joan Cox, Usha Chilukuri-Vance re #13 MOTION for Usha Chilukuri Vance to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264485), #12 MOTION for Erin Joan Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264474), #11 MOTION for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264444). (LST)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Disney Enterprises, Inc.. (Craig, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Usha Chilukuri Vance to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264485)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Erin Joan Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264474)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Disney Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4264444)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert)
January 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #10 MOTION for MICHAEL A. ROBERTS to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Antony ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4262621) (LST)
January 17, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Michael A. Roberts re #10 MOTION for MICHAEL A. ROBERTS to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Antony ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4262621). (LST)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for MICHAEL A. ROBERTS to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Antony ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4262621)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Stacy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Prewitt on behalf of John Antony (Prewitt, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC. TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD. 1. DEI to move, answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint filed in this actin is extended until 2/13/19. DEI has authorized the undersigned counsel to accept service of process, also without consenting or waiving any objections to jurisdiction or venue.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/15/2019.(LST)cc: COR
January 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Disney Enterprises, Inc. (LST)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert B. Craig. #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Disney Enterprises, Inc. has been filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (LST)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Disney Enterprises, Inc.. (Craig, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: ILLEGIBLE document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; The main document did not convert correctly and parts of the complaint were illegible; re #1 Complaint ; Correct document attached to this entry. cc: COR (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Registration, #3 Summons)(LST)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (TJZ)
December 17, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TJZ)cc: COR
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Disney Enterprises, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (TJZ)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4241662), filed by John Antony. (Attachments: #1 Ex A-Certificate of Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(TJZ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/6/2019) (LST).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antony v. Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Antony
Represented By: Stacy A. Cole
Represented By: Thomas A. Prewitt
Represented By: Michael A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Joan Cox
Represented By: Usha Chilukuri Vance
Represented By: Glenn D. Pomerantz
Represented By: Robert B. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?