Cochran v. USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. of Texas et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin P. Cochran
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company and USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. of Texas
Case Number: 2:2019cv00010
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: That the following procedure be used to address discovery disputes:1) Parties shall first meet and/or confer in good faith and attempt to resolve discovery disputes between themselves, without judicial intervention; 2) If the parties are unable to resolve a dispute after conferring directly, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by calling the undersigned's chambers to schedule an informal telephone conference; and, 3) If, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their discovery impasse after informal telephone conference, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required by Civil Rule 37(a)(1) and Local Rule of Civil Practice 37.1, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/18/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR DOCKET CALL held on 3/13/2019 before Judge William O. Bertelsman: Parties present as noted. IT IS ORDERED that the Court adopts the parties' Joint Report of Parties Planning Meeting #7 as follows:1) Discovery shall be completed on or before September 13, 2019 with joint or separate status reports due the same date. 2) On or before July 12, 2019, plaintiff shall disclose expert witnesses as required by Rule 26(a)(2). On or before August 16, 2019 defendant shall disclose expert witnesses as required by Rule 26(a)(2). 3) On or before May 1, 2019, the parties shall amend pleadings or join additional parties. 4) Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before October 11, 2019. Although documents must now be filed electronically with the Court Clerk, a PAPER court courtesy copy shall be provided to CHAMBERS within 48 hours of the filing of the brief or memorandum in support of any motion, where such brief or memorandum (including any attached exhibits) exceeds 10 pages. (Court Reporter LISA WIESMAN.) (ECO)cc: COR
March 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (ECO)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steinmetz, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY,MARCH 13, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 2/15/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company.(Steinmetz, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(LST)cc: COR
February 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (LST)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA, Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company.. (LST)
February 6, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company, filed by Benjamin P. Cochran. Filed as Part of State Court Record(LST)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-20. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4278846), filed by Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin P. Cochran
Represented By: Colby B. Cowherd
Represented By: Philip Taliaferro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty and Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander J. Kuebbing
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?