Jefferson v. AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Donna Jefferson
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC and Amazon.Com,LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Mayo, LaToi. #7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. has been filed by AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC;Amazon.com, Inc Amazon.Com,LLC; without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KRB)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Mayo, LaToi)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Being fully advised, and by agreement of the parties, Defendants Amazon.com.KYDC, LLC, Amazon.com, LLC, and Amazon.com, Inc. (Defendants or Amazon)shall have up to and including April 11, 2019, to file their responsive pleading.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 03/18/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #6 MOTION for Ted Copetas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Jefferson, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 03/14/2019. (KRB)cc: COR
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Mayo, LaToi)
March 13, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Ted Copetas re #6 MOTION for Ted Copetas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donna Jefferson ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4307385). (KRB)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Ted Copetas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donna Jefferson ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4307385)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McMahon, Robert)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Jefferson via Certified Mail to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Certified Mail)(McMahon, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB)
February 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(KRB)cc: COR
February 14, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #1 Complaint. Spoke to Plaintiff's counsel and advised we can only issue one summons per defendant. Counsel chose to not issue the SOS summons at this time and will just serve the physical address of the company (KRB)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4286135), filed by Donna Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Amazon.com.KYDC, #3 Summons Amazon.com KYDC SOS, #4 Summons amazon.com, LLC, #5 Summons Amazon.com, LLC SOS, #6 Summons Amazon.com Inc, #7 Summons Amazon.com, INC SOS, #8 Exhibit 1) EEOC Notice)(KRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elisabeth Laren
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM.KYDC, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elisabeth Laren
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com,LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elisabeth Laren
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jefferson
Represented By: Robert Anthony McMahon
Represented By: Ted Copetas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?