Hambrick v. Promevo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lesley Hambrick
Defendant: Promevo, LLC and Aaron Gumz
Case Number: 2:2019cv00017
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aaron Gumz, Promevo, LLC. (Furman, C.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, C. Furman. #6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Promevo, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron Gumz. Aaron Gumz waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Furman, C.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Promevo, LLC. Promevo, LLC waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Furman, C.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Gumz, Promevo, LLC. (Furman, C.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #4 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Lesley Hambrick, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 2/27/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
February 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #4 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lesley Hambrick ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4294931) (ECO)
February 26, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Stephen E. Imm re #4 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lesley Hambrick ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4294931). (ECO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lesley Hambrick ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4294931)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Finney, Christopher)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) This case is referred to the presiding Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, the case will revert back to the undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial. 2) in connection with such reference, the said Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to ruleon nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrialconference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(TJZ)cc: COR
February 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4288886), filed by Lesley Hambrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hambrick v. Promevo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Hambrick
Represented By: Christopher P. Finney
Represented By: Stephen E. Imm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promevo, LLC
Represented By: C. Dean Furman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Gumz
Represented By: C. Dean Furman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?