Sandmann v. Cable News Network, Inc. Featured Case

Nicholas Sandmann, a Kentucky high school student featured in a viral video that shows him wearing a Make America Great Again (MAGA) hat confronting a man, has filed a series of lawsuits against media companies including CNN, alleging that the media wrongfully targeted and bullied Nicholas because he was white, Catholic, and wearing a "Make America Great Again" cap.

Plaintiff: Nicholas Sandmann
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: 69 Stipulation of Dismissal (ECO)
July 29, 2020 Filing 69 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 67 Motion of Kyle M. Winslow to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.6 having been satisfied. Following the Clerk's service of this Virtual Order, Attorney Winslow may be termed from the docket sheet and removed from the case service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/4/2020. (ECO)cc: COR
May 1, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicholas Sandmann (ECO)
May 1, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicholas Sandmann Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Signed Consent, # 2 Proposed Order)(Winslow, Kyle)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: (1) the parties' construed Joint Motion to Stay 65 is hereby GRANTED; (2) this case is hereby STAYED until July 31, 2020; and (3) the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a further joint status report updating the Court on the status of settlement on or before July 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/29/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
April 27, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: 65 Status Report, re: 64 Order. (ECO)
April 24, 2020 Filing 65 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Sandmann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Kenton District Order, # 2 Exhibit B: Order Appointing Conservator)(McMurtry, Todd)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: That these parties file an additional status report on or before April 24, 2020, advising the Court of the status of their efforts to have a conservator appointed for plaintiff as part of the settlement process. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/8/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
February 24, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: 63 Status Report re 62 Order (ECO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 63 STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: 1) Motion for Extension of Time 61 is GRANTED; 2) Plaintiff shall have up to 2/25/2020 to file Status Report. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 2/19/2020.(TJZ)cc: COR
February 18, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Nicholas Sandmann Plaintiff's Status Report Regarding Additional Lawsuits (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text on 2/19/2020 (TJZ).
February 5, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: 60 Joint Status Report re 58 Order. (ECO)
February 4, 2020 Filing 60 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
January 15, 2020 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 1/7/2020 before Judge William O. Bertelsman. Court Reporter: Joan Averdick, Telephone number (859) 750-9440. Transcript ordered by: Plaintiff. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 2/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2020.
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: (1) The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report 56 be, and hereby is, GRANTED; and (2) On or before Tuesday, February 4, 2020, Plaintiff and CNN shall file a joint status report advising the Court of how they propose to finalize their settlement and, given that Plaintiff is a minor, what approval they will need to seek from this and any other Court. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/15/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AGREED ORDER: 1. On or before Monday, February 17, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a status report advising the Court of any additional lawsuits that have been filed in this Court and any additional lawsuits that may be filed in this Court concerning the events of January 18, 2019, at the National Mall. 2. Pursuant to the agreement reached at the January 7, 2020, conference, Plaintiff shall endeavor in good faith to file any additional lawsuit(s) that he expects to file in this Court concerning a republication of the statements of Nathan Phillips that Plaintiff "blocked" Phillips and "would not allow him to retreat" on January 18, 2019 at the National Mall, on or before March9, 2020, without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to file additional lawsuits prior to the expiration of the applicable statute of limitations. 3. After responsive pleadings have been filed in any additional lawsuits that have been commenced, the parties will file a status report proposing a new date to hold a joint Rule 26(t) Conference. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/15/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
January 14, 2020 Filing 56 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Cable News Network, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burke, James) Modified text to take out referral language on 1/14/2020 (ECO).
January 14, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: 55 Proposed Agreed Order re 54 Minute Entry Order. (ECO)
January 13, 2020 Filing 55 Proposed Agreed Order by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/7/2020 before Judge William O. Bertelsman: Parties present as noted. IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The parties shall submit a proposed agreed order on or before Monday, January 13, 2020, setting forth a proposed timeline for plaintiff's filing of any additional suits in this Court; (2) On or before Tuesday, January 21, 2020, plaintiff and CNN shall file a joint status report advising the Court of how they propose to finalize their settlement and, given that plaintiff is a minor, what approval they will need to seek from this and any other Court; and (3) Completion of the scheduling conference and commencementof any discovery are hereby STAYED pending further order of the Court. (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/8/2020. (ECO)cc: COR
January 3, 2020 Filing 53 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McMurtry, Todd)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The parties Joint Motion to extend time to submit Discovery Plans 51 , and the same being well taken, the extension of time untilFriday, January 3, 2020 is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/2/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
December 31, 2019 Filing 51 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Nicholas Sandmann to Submit Discovery Plans . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension to Submit Discovery Plans)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text to take out referral language on 1/2/2020 (ECO).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 49 MOTION for Mary Andreleita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cable News Network, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 12/19/2019. (ECO)cc: COR Modified text on 12/19/2019 (ECO).
December 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re 49 MOTION for Leita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4546439) (ECO)
December 16, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Leita Walker re 49 MOTION for Leita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4546439). (ECO)
December 16, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Leita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4546439)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Signed Affidavit of Leita Walker, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing for Leita Walker, # 3 Proposed Order)(Stubblefield, Amanda)
December 13, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Cable News Network, Inc..(Burke, James)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: (1) The joint motion 46 is GRANTED; (2) The currently scheduled SCHEDULING CONFERENCE shall be continued until January 7, 2020 at 01:00 PM. (3) CNN shall have up to and including December 13, 2019, to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; and (4) All other directives contained in the Court's October 30, 2019 Order (Doc. 43 ) remain in place. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/7/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
November 6, 2019 Filing 46 JOINT MOTION to Continue by Nicholas Sandmann . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text to take out referral language on 11/7/2019 (ECO).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED ORDER: re: 44 Order on Motion to Dismiss. ***AMENDED to correct the Docket Entry number for the Court's Order entered on 10/30/2019 to DE 43 .*** All other aspects for the Order remain the same. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/31/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: That the defendant's motion to dismiss 31 be, and is hereby, DENIED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/31/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: 1. That the motion of the plaintiff to file the tendered amended complaint 39 be, and it is, hereby GRANTED; 2. That the Rule 26(f) discovery schedule set in the Washington Post Case (2:19-cv-19-WOB-CJS) be also followed in this case, including the date set for the discovery conference and for preparation for it. A copy of that Order (Doc. 64 in 2:19-cv-19-WOB-CJS) is attached hereto and made a part hereof by reference. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Order filed in 2:19-cv-19 Sandmann v. WP Company, LLC DE 64)(ECO)cc: COR
August 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re 39 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Nicholas Sandmann (ECO)
August 21, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY BRIEF to Motion 39 , Response 41 in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (ECO).
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Leave by Nicholas Sandmann filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles D. Tobin, # 2 Exhibit A - Transcript of July 1, 2019 Oral Argument in Sandmann v. WP Company, LLC)(Burke, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Nicholas Sandmann of Joinder in Defendant's Request for Oral Argument on Defendant's re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Cable News Network, Inc. (McMurtry, Todd) Modified text to better describe document on 8/2/2019 (ECO).
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Todd McMurtry re 39 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Nicholas Sandmann. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified to better describe document and to take out referral language on 7/31/2019 (ECO).
July 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Cable News Network, Inc. (ECO)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO James Burke re 38 REPLY. Error: alink was not created to the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion 31 , thereby placing the reply on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is "Reply to Response to Motion". No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to 31 Defendant Cable News Network, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Burke, James) Modified text to create link to Motion on 7/18/2019 (ECO).
June 26, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Cable News Network, Inc. filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (McMurtry, Todd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Sandmann via Certified Mail to Cable News Network, Inc. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt)(McMurtry, Todd)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: That the Motion 34 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is permitted to file a brief opposing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim not to exceed forty ( 40) pages. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/14/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
June 12, 2019 Filing 34 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nicholas Sandmann . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order EXHIBIT A)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text to take out referral language on 6/12/2019 (ECO).
May 15, 2019 Filing 33 CONVENTIONAL FILING received on behalf of Cable New Network, Inc.. 6 CDs containing Videos and Reports (Banyamyan Video; Sandmann Video; "Unfiltered" Report; "CNN Newroom Report"; "New Day Weekend" Report; "Erin Burnett OutFront" Report are filed per re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Cable News Network, Inc. , 32 Notice of Filing. (MAINTAINED ON THE SHELF IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE) (ECO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING by Cable News Network, Inc. of Video Exhibits Filed Conventionally (Burke, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Cable News Network, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Banyamyan Video, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Sandmann Video, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Images from L. Lin Wood Video, # 5 Exhibit 4 - January 19, 2019 "Unfiltered" Report, # 6 Exhibit 5 - January 19, 2019 "CNN Newsroom" Report, # 7 Exhibit 6 - January 20, 2019 "New Day Weekend" Report, # 8 Exhibit 7 - January 22, 2019 "Erin Burnett OutFront" Report, # 9 Exhibit 8 - TODAY Transcript, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Statements Chart, # 11 Notice of Conventional Filing of Video Exhibits, # 12 Proposed Order)(Burke, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 30 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTof Cable News Network, Inc. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Burke, James)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 28 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Nicole Wade
May 9, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candance J. Smith for review: re 28 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356671) (ECO)
May 9, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Nicole Jennings Wade re 28 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356671). (ECO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356671)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, by and through his parents and natural guardians, Ted Sandmann and Julie Sandmann ("Plaintiff") and Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. ("Defendant"), by counsel, hereby agree that Defendant shall have an additional 14 days, up toand including May 15, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff and Defendant also agree that Plaintiff shall have an additional 14 days, up to and including June 26, 2019, to respond to any motion the Defendant files in lieu of an answer, and that Defendant will have an additional 7 days, up to and including July 17, 2019, to file a reply.Plaintiff and Defendant having so agreed, the parties respectfully request that the Court enter this Agreed Order. SO ORDERED: This 30th day of April, 2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/30/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
April 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re 26 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time by Cable News Network, Inc. (ECO)
April 26, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Stubblefield, Amanda)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 23 Motion for Maxwell S. Mishkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cable News Network, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/23/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Maxwell S. Mishkin
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 22 Motion for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cable News Network, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/23/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Charles D. Tobin
April 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re 22 MOTION for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4337374), 23 MOTION for Maxwell S. Mishkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4337375) (ECO)
April 17, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Charles D. Tobin, Maxwell S. Mishkin re 22 MOTION for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4337374), 23 MOTION for Maxwell S. Mishkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4337375). (ECO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Maxwell S. Mishkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4337375)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Signed Affidavit of Maxwell S. Mishkin, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Maxwell S. Mishkin, # 3 Proposed Order)(Stubblefield, Amanda)
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4337374)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Signed Affidavit of Charles D. Tobin, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Charles D. Tobin, # 3 Proposed Order)(Stubblefield, Amanda)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED ORDER: Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, by and through his parents and natural guardians, Ted Sandmann and Julie Sandmann and Defendant Cable News Network, Inc., by counsel, hereby agree that Defendant shall have an additional 21 days, up to and including May 1, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff and Defendant also agree that Plaintiff shall have an additional 21 days, up to and including June 12,2019, to respond to any motion the Defendant files in lieu of an answer.Plaintiff and Defendant having so agreed, the parties respectfully request that the Court enter this Agreed Order. SO ORDERED this 10th day of April, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/10/2019.(ECO)cc: COR, copies mailed to Attorneys Tobin and Mishkin. Modified text on 4/11/2019 (ECO).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: That Defendant Cable News Network, Inc.s Motion to Admit James E. Burke Pro Hac Vice 18 is hereby granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/10/2010. (ECO)cc: COR
April 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: 19 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time by Cable News Network, Inc., 18 MOTION for James E. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4328325), ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re 18 MOTION for James E. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4328325) (ECO)
April 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Amanda Stubblefield re 17 Notice of Appearance; ERROR 1: Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. Attorney's signature should match the name under which attorney was admitted (Sarah A. Vonderbrink). No further action required by counsel as to Error 1. ERROR 2: re 18 MOTION for James E. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Error: attachment was insufficiently described as Exhibit A. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel as to Error 2. cc: COR (ECO)
April 8, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to James E. Burke re 18 MOTION for James E. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4328325). (ECO)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Stubblefield, Amanda)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for James E. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cable News Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4328325)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of James E. Burke, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order C - Proposed Order)(Stubblefield, Amanda) Modified to described affidavit on 4/8/2019 (ECO).
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Stubblefield, Amanda)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Stubblefield, Amanda)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 12 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/21/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Jonathan Grunberg
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 11 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/21/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney G. Taylor Wilson
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 10 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/21/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Lin Wood
March 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re 12 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4314006), 10 MOTION for L.Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4313989), 11 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4314000) (ECO)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Todd McMurtry re 12 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 10 MOTION for L.Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 11 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (ECO).
March 20, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to L. Lin Wood, G. Taylor Wilson, Jonathan D. Grunberg re 12 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4314006), 10 MOTION for L.Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4313989), 11 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4314000). (ECO)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4314006)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A-Certificate of Good Standing , # 2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (ECO).
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4314000)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A-Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (ECO).
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for L.Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4313989)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A-Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (ECO).
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY L. Lin Wood by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: # 1 Atty Admission and Info and Routing Form-No Record)(ECO)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jonathan D. Grunberg by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: # 1 Atty Admission and Info and Routing Form - No Record)(ECO)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY G. Taylor Wilson by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: # 1 Atty Admission and Info and Routing Form - No Record)(ECO)
March 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: that this matter is hereby REASSIGNED to the Honorable William O. Bertelsman of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 03/16/2019.(KRB)cc: COR Modified Text on 3/18/2019 (KRB).
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cable News Network, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
March 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4307589), filed by Nicholas Sandmann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Sidner Tweet, # 2 Exhibit B-Sellers Tweet, # 3 Exhibit C-Jake Tapper on Twitter, # 4 Exhibit D-Greater Cincinnati Investigation, Inc. Report, # 5 Exhibit E-Diocese of Covington Letter, # 6 Exhibit F-Cupp Retweets, # 7 Exhibit G-Williams, CNN Article, # 8 Exhibit H-CNN Heartbreaking Viral Video Report, # 9 Exhibit I-Sidner, CNN Interview of Phillips, # 10 Exhibit J-Grinberg, CNN Article, # 11 Exhibit K-Moya-Smith Report, # 12 Exhibit L-Williams and Grinberg, CNN Article, # 13 Exhibit M-Viral Video Pictures, # 14 Exhibit N-McLauglin, CNN Article, # 15 Exhibit O-Vera, CNN Article, # 16 Exhibit P-Cupp Unfiltered on Twitter, # 17 Exhibit Q-CNN on Twitter, # 18 Exhibit R-CNN on Twitter, # 19 Exhibit S-CNN on Twitter, # 20 Summons to Cable News Network, Inc., # 21 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandmann v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sandmann
Represented By: Kyle M. Winslow
Represented By: Todd VanDerVeer McMurtry
Represented By: G. Taylor Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan D. Grunberg
Represented By: L. Lin Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?