Sandmann v. NBC Universal Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sandmann
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00056
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Sandmann via Certified Mail to NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt)(McMurtry, Todd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #16 Motion for John C. Greiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration form to Attorney John Greiner
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for John C. Greiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NBCUniversal Media, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4382405)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, James)
June 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John C. Greiner re #16 MOTION for John C. Greiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NBCUniversal Media, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4382405). (ECO)
June 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #16 MOTION for John C. Greiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NBCUniversal Media, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4382405) (ECO)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER extending the time for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 up to, and including, JULY 29, 2019. SO ORDERED THIS 10th DAY OF JULY, 2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/10/2019.(ECO)cc: COR Modified bold text on 6/10/2019 (ECO).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NBCUniversal Media, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, James) Modified text to take out referral language on 6/10/2019 (ECO).
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren W. Ford on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Ford, Darren)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Stephen Smith on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Smith, James)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #7 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #6 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #5 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of ECF Registration Form to Attorney Nicole Wade
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #4 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Sandmann, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/13/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
May 9, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jonathan D. Grunberg, L. Lin Wood, Nicole Jennings Wade, G. Taylor Wilson re #6 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355227), #7 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355229), #4 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355217), #5 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355222). (ECO)
May 9, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355227), #7 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355229), #4 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355217), #5 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355222) (ECO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355229)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355227)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Nicole Jennings Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355222)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Sandmann ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4355217)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McMurtry, Todd)
May 2, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NBC Universal Media, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010.(KRB)cc: COR
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4349418), filed by Nicholas Sandmann.(KRB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A.Note to Viewers, #4 Exhibit B.Editor's Note, #5 Exhibit C.Tweet) (KRB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #6 Exhibit D.Statement of Nick Sandmann, #7 Exhibit E.Statement of Diocese of Covington, #8 Exhibit F.GCI Report, #9 Exhibit G.Letter from Bishop Foys) (KRB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #10 Exhibit H.NBC First Article, #11 Exhibit I.NBC Second Article, #12 Exhibit J.NBC Third Article, #13 Exhibit K.NBC Fourth Article) (KRB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #14 Exhibit L.NBC Fifth Article, #15 Exhibit M.NBC Sixth Article, #16 Exhibit N.Retraction Deman) (KRB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandmann v. NBC Universal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Smith
Represented By: John C. Greiner
Represented By: Darren W. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sandmann
Represented By: Todd VanDerVeer McMurtry
Represented By: Nicole Jennings Wade
Represented By: Kyle M. Winslow
Represented By: G. Taylor Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan D. Grunberg
Represented By: L. Lin Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?