Brockman v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Joey Brockman
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Brunswick Corporation Group Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00065
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Calhoun, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Calhoun, David)
July 2, 2019 Party Brunswick Corporation Group Long Term Disability Plan terminated per Chambers re: DE #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECO)
June 28, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECO)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO James Morgan re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal ; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joey Brockman (Morgan, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #8 MOTION for Edward C. Ahlers to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Joey Brockman, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/25/2019. (TJZ)cc: COR
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: that Defendant LINA shall have up and until July 19, 2019 to file an answer, motion or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #2 inthis action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/24/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
June 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Life Insurance Company of North America, #8 MOTION for Edward C. Ahlers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joey Brockman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4389649) (ECO)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO James Morgan re #8 MOTION for Edward C. Ahlers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joey Brockman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4389649) ; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
June 20, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Edward C. Ahlers re #8 MOTION for Edward C. Ahlers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joey Brockman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4389649). (ECO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending time to answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Calhoun, David) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (ECO).
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Edward C. Ahlers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joey Brockman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4389649)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Morgan, James) Modified to describe exhibit on 6/20/2019 (ECO).
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Brunswick Corporation Group Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (ECO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 USMS Summons Time Stamped) (ECO).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is hereby granted. (2) The Complaint is therefore filed of record. (3) Plaintiff may proceed without payment of costs or fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 2/29/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
May 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joey Brockman (ECO)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
May 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Joey Brockman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Life Ins. Co. of N. America, #3 Summons to Brunswick Corporation)(ECO)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joey Brockman. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brockman v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Roosevelt Joseph Stennis, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Brockman
Represented By: James W. Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Edward C. Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?