Adams v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Adams
Defendant: Subway Worldwide, Inc., Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Subway Worldwide Holdings, LLC and Foldcraft Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on or before July 31, 2019These disclosures should not be filed in the Court record.(2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings on or before September 1, 2019(3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures Deadline for Plaintiff on or before January 17, 2020Deadline for Defendant on or before February 28, 2020These reports should not be filed in the Court record.Supplementation of expert information as required by Rule 26(e)(2) will bemade in conjunction with Rule 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures.(4) Close of Expert Discovery on or before April 30, 2020(5) Close of All Discovery on or before May 29, 2020(6) Status Report on or before May 29, 2020 (close of discovery) (7) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before July 1, 2020(8) Copies of Memoranda A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda insupport of motions must be provided to Chambers within 48 hours ofelectronic filing; said courtesy copy should be in paper form or electronicformat (Using Word or WordPerfect) emailed to Judge Bunnings Chambers. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 07/01/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Foldcraft Co. re #9 Order For Meeting and Report,,, as to Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (Silletto, Aaron)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Silletto, Aaron)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Subway Worldwide Holdings, LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Subway Worldwide, Inc. for Subway Worldwide Holdings, LLC.. (Rives, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Subway Worldwide Holdings, LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc.. (Rives, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1)Parties to meet w/in 21 days to discuss nature/basis of claims and defenses and possibility for a prompt settlement, to make or arrange for the disclosures required and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2)10 days thereafter, parties to file a Joint Status Report containing: (a) proposed discovery plan; (b) parties estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; (c) parties belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; (d) parties' estimate as the probable length of trial; (e) whether the parties consent to the presiding magistrate judge for all purposes; 3)Should parties find that a joint report is not possible, parties to file individual reports which the Court will entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(LST)cc: COR
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
June 17, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00424. File, transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/17/19: This action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Eastern District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned to that division. L.R. 3.2 (f). cc: Counsel, ED/KY (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/17/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 6/17/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Foldcraft Co. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 6/17/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foldcraft Co. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 6/17/2019.]
June 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint filed in Gallatin Circuit Court (See DN #1 -2) by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Subway Worldwide Holdings, LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 6/17/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foldcraft Co. from Gallatin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00060. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2882713) filed by Foldcraft Co. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record) (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Adams
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Pride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Rives, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Rives, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Worldwide Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert Charles Rives, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foldcraft Co.
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?