James Albers, et al v. The Medical Protective Co., Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Joe Rutter, Kelly Martin, Christina Rutter, Deborah Worley, Roger Johnson, Richard Elliott, Tracy Esselman, Chelsea Johnson, Patrick Schmit, Jacob Cotter, Leona Beyer, Wayne Hatfield, Doug Callahan, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Deborah Doyle, Sherry Spangenberg, Randy Brewer, Stephanie Deaton, Jeff Potts, Theresa Helton, Carla Griessman, Edward Thiessen, Dominque Bray, Michael Brophy, Candi Mckinney, Laura Batsche, Joi Crowe, Brandon Mathis, Douglas Hayes, Edythe Bishop, Brandon Lacinak, Damon Deck, Caela Finnell, Harry Reynolds, Danielle Reed, Lonnie Wheeler, Robert Moore, Haley Payne, Judith Gardner, Briana Harris, Lynne List, Mark Funk, Jr., Patricia Shott, Elaine Waxler, Donald Smith, Deja Dunblap, Dorothy Rose, Kevin Hartness, Carol Pummell, Janet Cornett, Debbie Moore, Ricky Hounchell, Hilary Levandofsky, Lindsey Bray, Ashley Casey, Nancy Begley, Traci Mathews, Tracy Janson, Karen Crissinger, Hiram McCauley, Dorothea Hamilton, Anthony Bode, Susan Schock, Brittany Theilman, Katelyn Kauffman Houston, Desiree Peyton, Delores Scott, Karen Miller, Lennie Fossett, Julie Martin, Troy Wilder, Ashley Walker, Antoinette Benjamin, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Amber Johnson, Glenna Shafer, Brenda Conley, Jennifer Myers, Jennifer Hickey, Marcella McDonald, Kimberly Mayer, Daniel Webber, Diane Meyer, Darrell Earls, Carolyn Dotson, Jonathan Brunner, Timothy Hannon, Debra Henderson, Mackenzie Bender, Thomas Kellison, Karen Taylor, Greg Graber, Heather Pickett, Robert Runzt, Victoria Landrum, Eddie Stallings, Elsa Ieraci, Ailene Levan, Maurice Grabow, Charlann Shepherd, Gary Neu, Ben Thaeler, Erin Greelish, Ronald Schuster, Lindsay Walsh, Jack Marcheschi, Angela Buechel, Billy Dugger, William Moore, Caidan Bailey, Joseph Schimmel, William Dabney, Bryan Powers, Sara Jonas, Kenneth Conger, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Ollie Deaton, Douglas Drafts, Francene Cook, Frieda Aaron, Chris Ebbing, Jennifer Bookman, Denise Bess, Kaitlyn Boggs, Timothy Osborn, Jason Riley, Kathryn Howell, Michelle Agee, Sara Sauenstein, Orris Smoote, Renecia Cherry, Nick Benge, Tammy Jones, Terry Beil, Marjorie Newman, Patrick Stephenson, Duane Pelfrey, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, Sara Selm, Tom Meyers, Robin Schiller, Timothy Marshall, Laura Kranbuhl-McKee, Derrill Reynolds, Brenda Errgang, Kathleen Bushelman, Kevin McDonald, Sara Lane, Rita Houchell, Barbara Couch, Brian Atkins, Lenora Haggard, Dawn Dunklin, Tempie Stephenson, Valarie Kopp, Katherine Walls, Robert Masters, Dana Conley, Donald Moore, Mike Sand, Rebekah Brady, Christine Geralds, Jeffrey Poff, Rhonda Mains, Michael Crail, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Helen Ward, Karen Sisson, David Snider, Robert Densler, Elizabeth Compo, Ronald Rowley, Reba Morgan, Jody Bauer, Kimberly Jenkins, Junior Monroe, Asia Shannon, Josh Fogel, Nellie Davis, Jordan Vance, Karen Johnson, Jacqueline Judkins, Amanda Koch, Joel Blair, Evelyn Helton, Penny Brackett, Debbie Rodriguez, Todd Ray, Jeffrey Hyde, Josh Roy, Melissa Habermehl, Vera Moffitt, Patricia Adams, Thomas Atkinson, Phyllis Bechtold, Tonya Chisman, Jessica Hastings, Robert Mounce, Teresa McMillen, Melissa Braucher, Paul Scholz, Arlene Fait, Kathleen Teslcher, Alissa Hightchew Messer, Darlene Sterling, Sandra Lemmel, Kristine Dority, Ryan Hensley, Robert Houghton, Jr., Macy Acord, Dirk Hitchcock, Loretta Hon, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Sandra Roundtree, Courtney Hammons, Karen Higginbothan, Connie Undwerwood, Vivian Kiefer, Lyndsey Middendorf, Robert Campbell, Chelsea Hortman, Patrick Dugan, Boggs Boggs, Lisa Conley, Sharon Brice, Antoine Powell, Joseph Davis, Tom Lantry, Marjorie Eversole, Violet Whalen, Mark McMurren, Michelle Noble, Sherra Stratman, Christina Brashear, Rose Koehler, Jeff Peddicord, Adam Hartman, Sandra Dennis, Cathy Beil, David Conger, Clarence Phillips, Vicki Buschur, Donna Good, Francine Ford, Natasha Lainhart, Irene Hyde, Eric Courtney, Nancy Bowman, Jenna McCall, Kevin Schmit, Amanda Franks, Dana Setters, Chris Clark, Samantha Hamilton, Katrina Allen, George Arnold, Rhonda Scott, Sandra Radeke, Tara Brown, Nicholas Battista, David Shempert, Tammy Dale, Bunnavuth Chhun, Rebecca Applegate, Arletta Bowling, Dana Edwars, Nicole Baker, Heather McCann, Dawn Merland, Gerald Botner, Shannon Koehler, Janet Campbell, Bert Stidham, Thomas Barth, Jason Romer, Alyssa Jackson, Diana Ashcraft, Minuet Healy, Paul Baker, Deena Borchers, Martha Kibler, Kevin Elfers, Cindy Bartlett, Gerald Hammons, Joetta Nafe, Laura Weisbecker, Michelle Byar, Ryan Miller, Kameron McNeal, Kirstin Weisman, Tammy Hughes, Ali Scully, Denise Helton, Richard Stanfield, Kyra McClendon, Jill Morthland, Michelle Beavan, Celeste Hoffman, Christopher Atwood, Tim Moore, David Smith, Erma Jean Gilbert, Rachel Jones, James Albers, Larry Krech, Shirley Mains, Dannie Owens, Deborah Sturdivant, Michael Watkins, Carolyn Hursong, Billie Jane Moore, Brad Arnold, Katherine Prater, Tammie Little, Amber Croxson, Wendy Oberlander, Jenny Grimm, Tonya Neal, Thomas Augst, Gayle Bachmann, Judy Beck, James McCain, Karen Leger, Denise Benge, Michael Hillard, Michelle Walters, Beth Leisring, Valerie Reeves, John Richardson, Sherri Allen, Martha Hutton, Sherry Kidd, Vicki Wallace, Brian Thien, Zachary Stacy, Brenda Shell, Stephanie Jobe, Tracey Walsh, Latoya Bradshaw, Deborah Roark, Amanda Ayres, Damian Jackson, Tammy Mann, Kent Reynolds, Susan Griffin, Michael Cook, Kelly Hennessy, Sophia White, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Mona Eder, Michelle Keplinger, Lynn Haley, Christine Goldstein, Mary Ravenscraft, Mark Reed, Timothy Schulze, Marsha Martin, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jonathan Atwell, Michael Sander, Vicky Mains, Shannon Wallace, Chris Schepper, Jordan Ribariu, Michelle Sizemore, Tamala Lovette, Julie Freeman, Deborah Kidd, Lisa Reynolds, Patricia Boone, Barbara Hensley, Karen Feltner, Tiffany Meadows, Brenda Butler, William Benton, Jeff Remley, Ralph Dawson, George Hutchinson, Joseph Baumgardner, Timothy Whalen, Jennifer Ballinger, Samantha Redrow, Ruhama Hall, Joan Jones, Robbie Gregory, Teresa Nichols, Mike Koelblin, Jacklen Upchurch, Robert Houghton, Sr., Sarra Mueller, Charlotte King, Kelly Engle, Doris Botner, Amy Fuller, Gary L. Coots, Ryan Tanner, Terry Collins, Derek Mayfield, Katie Lehmkuhl, Randall Metcalf, Shandon Simmons, Kelly Robinson, Gloria Greene, Gail Nordeman, Mary Zureick, Joann Young, Calvin Brown, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Joann Frazier, Jared Wolfe, Vicky Wilson, Teresa Worley, Paula Wilson, Judy Young, Corrine Zachry, Priscilla Wittmeyer, Sara Hauenstein, William Wolder, Veronica Yeakle, Deja Dunlap, Stacy John Martin, Dawn Wingert, Keith Young, Joseph Wilson, Benjamin Williams, Terry Wilson, Carla Wooten, Paul Boggs, Amber Work, Robert Wilson, Paul Wilson, Cheryl Wyatt and Carol Wilson
Defendant: Paul Vollman, Esq., Mike Lyon, Esq., Berkshire Hathaway, Janik, L.L.P., Steve Janik, Esq., Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., James Brockman, Esq., Richard Marcello, The Medical Protective Company, Inc., Lindhorst & Dreidame Co., L.P.A., Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medpro Group, Inc., Bob Ignasiak, Mackenzie Walter and Tim Kenesey
Petitioner: West Chester Hospital, UC Health and West Chester Hospital, LLC
Executor: Stephen Carmen, Gordon Rister, Jodi Behrendt, Henry Curry, Richard Borein, Ciera Barr, Stacy Fletcher, Stephanie Hawks, Jack Buskirk, Kimberly Bates, Sharon Howard, Malika Bonner, Jean Fenner, Sandra Couch, Nancy Pfetsch, Misty Emerson, Heather Schuster, Melvin James, Linda Favaron, Richard Lozier, Tom Pritchard, Steven Bayliss, Paul Marksberry, Nancy Boland, Connie McClure-Ellington, Joseph Wilder, Jeffrey McClure, Donna Rister, Michael Collins, Cathy Holley, Fay Rosebery, Kenneth Pfetsch, Leslie Powers, Kathrynn Rueve, Christina Canfield, Jane Reeder, Carrie Britten, Holly Reifenberger, Robert Ellington and James Brown
Not Yet Classified: Warren Haley, David Huser, Patricia Bruce, Jackie Couch, Louise Bayliss, Sharon Pritchard, Annette Buskirk, Eileen Brorein, Carson Rutter, David Fisher, David Hall, Holly Decair, Tony Falkner, Lawrence Pridemore, Neil Favaron, Crystal Garrison, Mary Gerbus, Marcia Quinn, Christopher McCaughey, Ron Wright and Nora West
Case Number: 2:2019cv00088
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Karen K Caldwell
2 Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: 1) All pending motions are deemed MOOT; 2) all pending deadlines are considered SET ASIDE; and 3) this action is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the active docket of the Court.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/07/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
November 7, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Albers (Winter, Robert)
October 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of District Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. (KRB)
October 25, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Leave to File by James Albers , et al. Second Amended Complaint filed by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment Entry)(Barfield, Mindy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. filed by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Latimore v. State Farm Fire & Cas. Co., #2 Exhibit B - Judgment Entry)(Barfield, Mindy)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: 1. That the aforesaid motion #47 be, and it is, GRANTED; and 2. That Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss #18 by Friday, October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/17/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
October 16, 2019 Filing 47 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medpro Group, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barfield, Mindy) Modifiedtext to take out referral language on 10/17/2019 (ECO).
October 16, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Substitute Party by Gail Nordeman Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executor's Letters of Authority, #2 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs motion #43 isGRANTED.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/07/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
October 5, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by Gail Nordeman Suggestion of Death (Winter, Robert)
October 5, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by James Albers , et al. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
October 4, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. filed by James Albers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kentucky Department of Insurance -- Medical Protective Company, #2 Exhibit B -- Kentucky Secretary of State -- MedPro Group, Inc., f/k/a Medical Protective Corporation, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Eric C. Deters, #4 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
October 4, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File by James Albers , et al. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 motions to dismiss #11 , #35 are GRANTED. All claims in the complaint against Defendants Berkshire Hathaway, Mike Lyon, Lindhorst & Dreidame, Co. L.P.A., James Brockman, Paul Vollman, Steve Janik, Janik L.L.P., Richard Marcello, Mackenzie Walter, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, and Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall TERMINATE Berkshire Hathaway, Mike Lyon, Lindhorst & Dreidame, Co. L.P.A., James Brockman, Paul Vollman, Steve Janik, Janik L.L.P., Richard Marcello, Mackenzie Walter, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, and Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc. as defendants in this case.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/01/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1.That the aforesaid Motion #18 be, and it is, GRANTED; and 2.That plaintiffs file their opposition memoranda to defendants motion to dismiss #18 by Friday, October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/27/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
September 27, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiffs Unopposed Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Anthony) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (TJZ).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER : 1. That the aforesaid motion be, and is GRANTED; and 2. That plaintiffs shall file their opposition memorandum to defendant's motion to dismiss by Friday, September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/24/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
September 23, 2019 Filing 36 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. by James Albers Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by James Albers , et al. as to defenants Medical Protective Financial Corporation and Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc. only Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: 1) Motion for extension of time #33 is GRANTED; 2) Plaintiffs file their memorandum to defendants' motion to dismiss #18 by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/12/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
September 12, 2019 Filing 33 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. by James Albers , et al. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: 1.That the aforesaid Motion be, and it is, GRANTED; and2.That plaintiffs file their opposition memoranda to defendants motion to dismiss #18 by Friday, September 13, 2019.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/20/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. by James Albers , et al. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winter, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Medpro Group, Inc served on 7-12-19 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to The Medical Protective Company, Inc. COMPLETED on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Tim Kenesey served on 7/12/19 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Bob Ignasiak served on 7-12-19 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to MEDICAL PROTECTIVE FINANCIAL CORPORATION served on 7-12-19 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KRB)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On August 8, 2019, the undersigned entered a notice advising the parties that her stepson, Lloyd R. Cress, Jr., is employed as a non-equity member of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP, a law firm representing several of the Defendants in this matter. #23 Plaintiffs counsel responded to the notice, stating that if the [n]otice and disclosures therein constitute an invitation by the Court for plaintiffs to request that this action be reassigned, then plaintiffs request that the case be reassigned. #24 The Courts notice was not an invitation for a reassignment request. Rather, it was a courtesy extended in all cases with parties represented by Dinsmore & Shohl. Mr. Cresss employment at Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP does not constitute a mandatory, non-waivable conflict requiring recusal under 28 U.S.C. 455(b). See Unif. Masters v. McKesson Corp., 465 F. App'x 466, 468 (6th Cir. 2012). Moreover, Plaintiffs have not tendered any reasons why Mr. Cresss employment at the firm would affect the partiality of this tribunal. As such, unless there are any other objections, the undersigned will continue presiding over the matter.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/14/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
August 8, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 Court Notice filed by James Albers. (Winter, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE: All parties and counsel are hereby notified that the undersigneds stepson, Lloyd R. Cress, Jr., is employed as a non-equity member of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP. (LST)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. Wade P.K. Carr and Bruce E. Baty are admitted pro hav vice for the limited purpose of representing the MedPro Defendants. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/8/2019. (LST)cc: COR, Wade P.K. Carr via U.S. Mail w/ECF Registration form
August 7, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #20 MOTION for Wade P.K. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bob Ignasiak, et al, #21 MOTION for Bruce E. Baty to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bob Ignasiak, et al. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed re #20 MOTION for Wade P.K. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bob Ignasiak, et al, #21 MOTION for Bruce E. Baty to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bob Ignasiak, et al (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Bruce E. Baty to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4432242)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Barfield, Mindy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Wade P.K. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4432231)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Barfield, Mindy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs re #17 Order. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Complaint)(Romeo, Anthony) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (TJZ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Kenesy Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Ignasiak Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Barfield, Mindy) Modified to remove referral on 8/16/2019 (LST).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: the Court orders the Plaintiffs to refile their Complaint with paragraph 202 redacted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to place docket entry #1 under seal.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/01/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document #1 Complaint, by UC Health, West Chester Hospital filed by Plaintiffs (Romeo, Anthony) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (TJZ).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document #1 Complaint, by UC Health, West Chester Hospital Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Haggerty, Walter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc.; Summons issued with packet and returned to counsel by UPS for service by Secretary of State. (TJZ) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (TJZ).
July 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs (TJZ) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (TJZ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING by James Albers re #10 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons Bob Ignasiak, #2 Summons Tim Kenesey, #3 Summons The Medical Protective Company Inc., #4 Summons Medical Protective Financial Corporation, #5 Summons Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., #6 Summons MedPro Group Inc.)(Winter, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Winter, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Winter, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Partial As To Defendants Berkshire Hathaway, Mike Lyon, Lindhorst & Dreidame, Co. L.P.A, James Brockman, Paul Vollman, Steve Janik, Janik L.L.P., Richard Marcello And Mackenzie Walter (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Anthony) Modified to remove referral on 7/22/2019 (LST). Modified text on 7/22/2019 (TJZ).
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bob Ignasiak, Tim Kenesey, Medical Protective Financial Corporation, Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc., Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company, Inc., filed by plaintiffs.(Romeo, Anthony) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (TJZ).
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiffs via Certified Mail to Bob Ignasiak served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Tim Kenesey served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Richard Marcello served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Medical Protective Financial Corporation served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Medical Protective Insurance Services, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Medpro Group, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Mackenzie Walter served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Romeo, Anthony) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (TJZ).
July 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: #7 Order of Recusal (TJZ)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL: This matter is reassigned to the Hon. Karen K. Caldwell, Chief Judge of the USDC for the EDKY for reassignment. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/11/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: That the undersigned hereby RECUSES in this matter and, pursuant to General Order No. 18-14, this matter be, and is hereby, TRANSFERRED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID L. BUNNING. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/11/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
July 9, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010.(KRB)cc: COR
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4404037). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BH, #3 Summons Bob Ignasiak, #4 Summons James Brockman, #5 Summons Janik LPP, #6 Summons L&D, #7 Summons MW, #8 Summons Med Prot Comp, #9 Summons Med Pro Fin Co, #10 Summons Med Pro Ins, #11 Summons Medpro group, #12 Summons PV, #13 Summons ML, #14 Summons RM, #15 Summons SJ, #16 Summons TK)(KRB) sealed pursuant to #17 Modified on 8/1/2019 (KRB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Albers, et al v. The Medical Protective Co., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Stephen Carmen
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Gordon Rister
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jodi Behrendt
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Henry Curry
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Richard Borein
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Ciera Barr
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Stacy Fletcher
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Stephanie Hawks
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jack Buskirk
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Kimberly Bates
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Sharon Howard
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Malika Bonner
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jean Fenner
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Sandra Couch
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Nancy Pfetsch
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Misty Emerson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Heather Schuster
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Melvin James
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Linda Favaron
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Richard Lozier
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Tom Pritchard
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Steven Bayliss
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Paul Marksberry
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Nancy Boland
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Connie McClure-Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Joseph Wilder
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jeffrey McClure
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Donna Rister
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Michael Collins
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Cathy Holley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Fay Rosebery
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Kenneth Pfetsch
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Leslie Powers
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Kathrynn Rueve
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Christina Canfield
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jane Reeder
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Carrie Britten
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Holly Reifenberger
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Robert Ellington
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: James Brown
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Rutter
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Martin
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Rutter
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Worley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Elliott
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Esselman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Schmit
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Cotter
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Beyer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hatfield
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Callahan
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruvimbo Nyemba
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Doyle
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Spangenberg
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Brewer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Deaton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Potts
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Helton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Griessman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thiessen
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominque Bray
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brophy
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi Mckinney
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Batsche
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joi Crowe
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mathis
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hayes
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edythe Bishop
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lacinak
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Deck
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caela Finnell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Reynolds
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Reed
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Wheeler
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Payne
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gardner
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Harris
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne List
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Funk, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Shott
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Waxler
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Smith
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deja Dunblap
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Rose
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hartness
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Pummell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Cornett
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Moore
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hounchell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Levandofsky
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Bray
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Casey
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Begley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Mathews
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Janson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Crissinger
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram McCauley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Hamilton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bode
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Schock
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Theilman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Kauffman Houston
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Peyton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Scott
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Miller
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Fossett
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Martin
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Wilder
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Walker
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Benjamin
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Messerschmidt
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenna Shafer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Conley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Myers
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hickey
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella McDonald
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mayer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Webber
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Meyer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Earls
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Dotson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Brunner
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hannon
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Henderson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Bender
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kellison
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Taylor
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Graber
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Pickett
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Runzt
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Landrum
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Stallings
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Ieraci
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ailene Levan
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Grabow
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlann Shepherd
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Neu
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Thaeler
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Greelish
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schuster
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Walsh
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Marcheschi
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Buechel
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dugger
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moore
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caidan Bailey
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schimmel
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dabney
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Powers
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Jonas
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Conger
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry McNeal
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia McQueary
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Deaton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Drafts
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francene Cook
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda Aaron
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Ebbing
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bookman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bess
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Boggs
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Osborn
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Riley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Howell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Agee
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Sauenstein
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orris Smoote
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renecia Cherry
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Benge
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jones
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Beil
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Newman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Stephenson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Pelfrey
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lee Ann Brown
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Selm
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Meyers
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Schiller
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Marshall
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Kranbuhl-McKee
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrill Reynolds
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Errgang
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bushelman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McDonald
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Lane
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Houchell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Couch
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Atkins
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Haggard
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Dunklin
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tempie Stephenson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Kopp
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Walls
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Masters
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Conley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moore
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sand
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Brady
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Geralds
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Poff
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Mains
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crail
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Puckett-Morrissette
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Tubbs-Hills
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Ward
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sisson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Snider
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Densler
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Compo
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rowley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reba Morgan
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Bauer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jenkins
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Monroe
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Shannon
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Fogel
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Davis
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Vance
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Judkins
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Koch
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Blair
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Helton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Brackett
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Rodriguez
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Ray
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hyde
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Roy
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Habermehl
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Moffitt
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Adams
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Atkinson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Bechtold
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Chisman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hastings
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mounce
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa McMillen
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Braucher
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Scholz
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Fait
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Teslcher
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Hightchew Messer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Sterling
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lemmel
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Dority
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hensley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Houghton, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macy Acord
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk Hitchcock
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Hon
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Robbinson-Woods
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Roundtree
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Hammons
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Higginbothan
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Undwerwood
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Kiefer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndsey Middendorf
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Campbell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Hortman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dugan
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boggs Boggs
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Conley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brice
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Powell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Davis
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Lantry
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Eversole
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Whalen
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McMurren
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Noble
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherra Stratman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Brashear
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Koehler
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Peddicord
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Hartman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dennis
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Beil
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conger
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Phillips
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Buschur
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Good
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Ford
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Lainhart
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Hyde
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Courtney
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Bowman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna McCall
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Schmit
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Franks
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [