Blazin Wings, Inc. v. Barnhill
Plaintiff: Blazin Wings, Inc.
Defendant: Jacob Barnhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VIRTUAL ORDER: denying as moot #9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Blazin Wings, Inc., the Court having now granted the Amended Motion #13 for counsel's pro hac vice admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/26/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Atty Leslie Gelhar.
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #13 Amended Motion for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Blazin Wings, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/26/2019. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and ECF Registration Form mailed to Atty Leslie Gelhar.
September 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blazin Wings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460650) by Blazin Wings, Inc. (ECO)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blazin Wings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460650) by Blazin Wings, Inc. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Standing Certificate for Minnesota, #2 Exhibit B - Good Standing Certificate for Ohio, #3 Exhibit C - Good Standing Certificate in Iowa, #4 Appendix Notice of Leslie A. Gelhar's Disclosure in Compliance with Local Rule 83.2(a), #5 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Leslie A. Gelhar, #6 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie Gelhar)(Schoeni, K.)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY,OCTOBER 9, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M. to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/19/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Atty Leslie Gelhar. Modified text on 9/19/2019 (ECO).
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, JACOB BARNHILL, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Jacob Barnhill.(Yeager, Stephen)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: That the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leslie A. Gelhar #9 is hereby taken under advisement pending counsel's filing by September 30, 2019 of a Notice with the required disclosure of whether counsel "is currently or has ever been disbarred, suspended from practice, or subject to other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory, or the District of Columbia." Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/18/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Attorney Leslie Gelhar
September 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blazin Wings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460650) (ECO)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO K. Schoeni re #9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Error : Exhibits were filed together with the motion and the attached affidavit at attachment #1 instead of as separate attachments. Entry by attorney; Clerk filed the exhibits as separate attachments with a clear and concise description. In the future, file each exhibit separately from one another and separate from the main document. cc:COR (ECO)
September 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Leslie A. Gelhar re #9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blazin Wings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460650). (ECO)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leslie A. Gelhar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blazin Wings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460650)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leslie A. Gelhar in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Schoeni, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #3 Affidavit of Leslie Gelhar, #4 Exhibit A- Minnesota Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit B-Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Exhibit C-Iowa Certificate of Good Standing) (ECO).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: That Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Answer out of Time #7 is hereby granted. Defendant shall have up to and including September 19, 2019, within which to file his Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/10/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
September 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jacob Barnhill (ECO)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jacob Barnhill Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Yeager, Stephen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blazin Wings, Inc. via personal service to Jacob Barnhill served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Schoeni, K.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
July 30, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blazin Wings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IBR Holding Corp., Other Affiliate The Wendy's Company for Blazin Wings, Inc. (ECO)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jacob Barnhill; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4424188), filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Jacob Barnhill)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blazin Wings, Inc. v. Barnhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blazin Wings, Inc.
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Represented By: Leslie A. Gelhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Barnhill
Represented By: Stephen M. Yeager
Represented By: Stephen S. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?