White v. Warden, Southeastern Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Demarco White
Respondent: Warden, Southeastern Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2019cv00106
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
2 Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: 1. The Court ENTERS Judgment in favor of the Respondent.2. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/8/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to DeMarco White, pro se at address listed on the docket sheet.
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION & ORDER: 1. DeMarco White's petition for a writ of habeas corpus #1 is DENIED. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/8/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to DeMarco White, pro se at address listed on the docket sheet.
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: That this case be, and is hereby, REFERRED TO THE STAFF ATTORNEY OFFICE for processing. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/21/2019.(ECO)cc: COR, PSO, Copy mailed to Demarco White, pro se Petitioner at address listed on the docket sheet. Modified text on 8/21/2019 (ECO).
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail w/ copy of docket sheet (Attachments: #1 Caption Page)(KRB)
August 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Ingram for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) transferred in from the Southern District of Ohio. (TDA)
August 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-03369. File and transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: White via US Mail
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/13/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/13/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 9/4/2019. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/13/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency: This case was filed without the required filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Application and Affidavit by an Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/13/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Demarco White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope) (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Warden, Southeastern Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Southeastern Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demarco White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?