Middleton v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Middleton
Defendant: Norma Lawless, George Griffin, Michael Murphy, Jr. Wayne D. Lewis, Kelly Foster, Jesse Bacon, Sam Watkins, Kentucky Department of Education, AdvancED and Julia Rawlings
Case Number: 2:2019cv00110
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AdvancED. (O'Brien, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (ECO)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Thomas O'Brien re #7 Joint Motion; Error: the incorrect event "Joint Motion" was selected. Entry by Attorney; Clerk re-defined the document as a Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER/STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AdvancED, Jesse Bacon, Jesse Bacon (Agreed Order) Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (O'Brien, Thomas) Modified to add correct event on 10/16/2019 (ECO).
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kelly Foster, Kelly Foster, Kentucky Department of Education, Norma Lawless, Norma Lawless, Wayne D. Lewis, Wayne D. Lewis, Michael Murphy, Michael Murphy, Julia Rawlings, Julia Rawlings, Sam Watkins, Sam Watkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contracts Rawlings/Lawless, #2 Exhibit Diagnostic Review, #3 Exhibit Board Minutes and Notification Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Allen, Todd)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Kelly Middleton re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(Chevalier, Marianne)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Marianne Chevalier re #4 Notice of Filing; a scanned copy of the Verification was not attached to the Notice of filing. within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing", attach a scanned copy of the Verification with the original signature of the affiant and notary. (ECO)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Kelly Middleton re #1 Complaint (Chevalier, Marianne)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Marianne Chevalier re #1 Verification attached to the Complaint; a scanned copy of the original signature for the affiant andnotary must be filed. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days,prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event"Notice of Filing," attach a scanned copy of the Verification with the originalsignature of the affiant and notary. cc: COR (ECO)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
August 20, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4442823), filed by Kelly Middleton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #2 Kelly Middleton Verification) (ECO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Lawless
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jr. Wayne D. Lewis
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Foster
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Bacon
Represented By: Thomas Patrick O'Brien, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Watkins
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Education
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvancED
Represented By: Thomas Patrick O'Brien, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Rawlings
Represented By: Todd Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Middleton
Represented By: Marianne Schaefer Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?