Kozlowska v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Anna Kozlowska
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2019cv00113
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #10 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/4/2019. (TJZ)cc: COR
October 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #10 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4479284) (TJZ)
October 2, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed re #10 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4479284). (TJZ)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4479284)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Kevin)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) Within 21 days counsel shall conduct the meeting required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement and to develop a case management plan. 2) Counsel shall determine whetherthis action is exempt from the Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. If the action is not exempt, the parties shall make the required disclosures within the time frame required and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required. 3) Within 10 days after the meeting, parties shall file a joint statusreport containing: a) identity of each participant and the party each participant represents; b) parties views and proposals required by Rule 26(f); c) whether settlement is a possibility; d) whether the parties agree as to the exact nature of this action under ERISA; e) length of time necessary tofile administrative record and other relevant documents; f) length of time necessary to join other parties/amend pleadings; g) whether the parties agree concerning discovery beyond that contained in the administrative record. If the parties do not agree, each party shall submit a memorandum of points andauthorities on whether discovery is needed or permissible. These memoranda shall not exceed 5 pages and should address the holding of the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals in Wilkins v. Baptist Healthcare Sys., Inc., 150 F.3d 609, 618 (6th Cir. 1998) as well as any other relevant authority; h) length of time necessary tofile dispositive motions; i) whether the parties agree as to the applicable standard of review should be applied. If the parties do not agree, each party shall submit a memorandum of points and authorities regarding the standard of review applicable with the parties report of planning meeting. Thesememoranda shall not exceed 5 pages in length; j) whether the parties desire a scheduling conference before entry of a scheduling order; k) identify any other issues that are unique to this action; l) whether parties consent to jurisdiction of Mag Judge pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). 4) If joint report is not possible, individual reports shall be filed. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(TJZ)cc: COR
September 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #8 Answer to Complaint (TJZ)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Roberts, Kevin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: That Defendant is granted an extension of time to and including September 26, 2019 in which to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 8/30/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
August 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (TJZ)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
August 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (ECO)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Edward Roberts on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (ECO)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mason Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00195. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4445890), filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozlowska v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Kevin Edward Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Kozlowska
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?