Miller v. Housing Authority of Covington
Plaintiff: Janice Miller
Defendant: Housing Authority of Covington
Case Number: 2:2019cv00125
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Housing Authority of Covington. (Cole, Charles)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Housing Authority of Covington. (Cole, Charles)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janice Miller. Housing Authority of Covington waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Bailey, Donyetta)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Janice Miller, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/18/2019. (TJZ)cc: COR
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Janice Miller re #4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Janice Miller ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464390) Ohio Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing (Bailey, Donyetta)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Janice Miller re #4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Janice Miller ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464390) (Bailey, Donyetta)
September 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Janice Miller ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464390) (TJZ)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Donyetta D. Bailey re #4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Janice Miller; attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Donyetta D. Bailey; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit 1. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments.Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR(TJZ)
September 16, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed re #4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Janice Miller ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464390). (TJZ)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Donyetta D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Janice Miller ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464390)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Donyetta) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (TJZ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (ECO).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
September 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4463620), filed by Janice Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Charge Discrimination, #3 Exhibit 2-EEOC Dismissal)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Housing Authority of Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of Covington
Represented By: Charles David Cole
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Janet Shilan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Miller
Represented By: Donyetta D. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?