Gahman v. BST North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stanley Gahman
Defendant: BST North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00153
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on or before 12/15/2019. 2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings on or before 12/31/2019/ (3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures for Plaintiff on or before 2/15/2020, for Defendant on or before 3/15/2020. 4) All Discovery on or before 5/15/2020. 5) Status Report on or before 5/15/2020. 6) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before 7/15/2020. 7) Copies of Memoranda A courtesy copy of briefs/memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 12/3/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
December 2, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #10 Parties' Joint Meeting Report. (TJZ)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 PARTIES' JOINT MEETING REPORT by Stanley Gahman. (Monohan, Patrick) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (TJZ).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #6 MOTION for Alexander P. Will to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant BST North America, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/18/2019. (TJZ)cc: COR
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Souhila EL Moussaoui by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Data Sheet - No Record Found)(ECO)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2) Within 10 days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: a) the proposed discovery plan; b) estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) whether the matter is suitable for some form of ADR such as mediation; d) estimate as to the probable length of trial; e) whether the parties will consent to the jurisdiction of a MagistrateJudge (Smith) for all further proceedings, including trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(TJZ)cc: COR
October 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 MOTION for Alexander P. Will to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BST North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4506511) (TJZ)
October 29, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed re #6 MOTION for Alexander P. Will to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BST North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4506511). (TJZ)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Alexander P. Will to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BST North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4506511)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Woods, C.)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1. Incorrect filed date entered; Entry by Clerk. Correction: filed date changed from 10/28/2019 to 10/25/2019; no further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
October 28, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by BST North America, Inc.. (Filed as part of State Court record DE #1 -#2 Exhibit A-State Court Record). (ECO)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
October 28, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BST North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BST North International for BST North America, Inc.. (ECO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Laurence Woods, III on behalf of BST North America, Inc. (ECO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01691. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4505099), filed by BST North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 (Incorrect) Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Khamphouy)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gahman v. BST North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BST North America, Inc.
Represented By: Souhila EL Moussaoui
Represented By: C. Laurence Woods, III
Represented By: Alexander P. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Gahman
Represented By: Edward S. Monohan, IV
Represented By: Patrick J. Monohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?