Furnish v. Hart
Petitioner: Fred Furnish
Respondent: DeEdra Hart
Case Number: 2:2019cv00170
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Jamesa Drake: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #12 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, Jamesa Drake by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (ECO)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court GRANTS DE #11 and deems DE #11 -1 properly filed as the operative 2254 petition in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier on 1/15/2020. (ECO)cc: COR
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Fred Furnish (Attachments: #1 Appendix Amended habeas petition, #2 Proposed Order Leave to file amended petition)(Burke, Dennis)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Fred Furnish re #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Corrected habeas petition (Burke, Dennis)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0643-4564345.), filed by Fred Furnish.(KRB)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : 1. The Court GRANTS #1 and permits Furnish to proceed in forma pauperis in this case; 2. The Court DENIES #3 AS MOOT; and 3. The Court GRANTS #7 and APPOINTS Hon. Dennis Burke and Hon. Jamesa Drake, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3599, to jointly represent Petitioner in this capital post-conviction matter.. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Wier on 12/05/2019.(KRB)cc: COR Modified text on 1/9/2020 (KRB).
December 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #7 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Fred Furnish (TJZ)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Fred Furnish by Fred Furnish (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to appoint counsel)(Burke, Dennis) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (TJZ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Leo Robbins on behalf of DeEdra Hart (Robbins, Jesse)
November 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Fred Furnish, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fred Furnish (ECO)
November 27, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE HABEAS CORPUS PETITION by Fred Furnish (ECO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Fred Furnish (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ECO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Fred Furnish. (ECO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fred Furnish (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furnish v. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DeEdra Hart
Represented By: Jesse Leo Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fred Furnish
Represented By: Dennis J. Burke
Represented By: Jamesa J. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?