Discount Home Furnishings, Inc. v. Wayfair, LLC
Plaintiff: Discount Home Furnishings, Inc.
Defendant: Wayfair LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00171
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER: Wayfair, LLC's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/22/2020.(TJZ)cc: COR
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Beres, Joel)
January 21, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #11 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc. (TJZ)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: That Defendant Wayfair LLC's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaintis hereby extended to and including January 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 12/19/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time for Defendant Wayfair LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Beres, Joel)
December 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time for Defendant Wayfair LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc. (ECO)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc. via personal to Wayfair LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Beres, Joel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Beres, Joel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Joel Beres, Joseph Mattingly. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Discount Home Furnishings without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register., SKV (ECO)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wayfair LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4532795), filed by Discount Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COMAS Registration Certificates, #2 Exhibit B-Correspondence from Wayfair, #3 Exhibit C-Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Exhibit D-Cease and Desist Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Wayfair LLC)(ECO)
November 27, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discount Home Furnishings, Inc. v. Wayfair, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discount Home Furnishings, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H. Mattingly, III
Represented By: Joel T. Beres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayfair LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?