Unum Life Insurance Company Of America v. Cornelius et al
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Defendant: P.A.K., Robert K. Fessler, Amanda N. Cornelius and Richard M. Fessler
Case Number: 2:2020cv00036
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Richard M. Fessler; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Request for Issuance of Summons (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons for Richard Fessler)(Turner, Ann)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. Robert K. Fessler waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Turner, Ann)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. Amanda N. Cornelius waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020; P.A.K. waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Turner, Ann)
March 18, 2020 Clerk's Note: Filed submitted deleted re: DE #6 Request for Fee Refund. File submitted in error by Clerk. (ECO)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE OF FEE REFUND APPROVED re #6 Request for Fee Refund ; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. 0643-4620214 having been erroneously paid, the Clerk APPROVES the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $400.00 was successfully completed on 03/18/2020 at 08:29 AM ET cc: COR (ECO)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR FEE REFUND TO CREDIT CARD by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America . (Turner, Ann)
March 13, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Atkins for review: re #2 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) (SLG)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings is required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William 0. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010. (SLG)cc: COR
March 13, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLG)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. (SLG)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Deposit Interpleader Funds by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SLG) Modified on 3/13/2020 (SLG).
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT(NO PROCESS REQUESTED).( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4620256), filed by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit 3 12/12/19 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America v. Cornelius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Fessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda N. Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Fessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Ann Michelle Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?