Richardson v. Meggitt-USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kristina Richardson
Defendant: Meggitt-USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00057
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Clerk's Note: Counsel office advised Clerk that incorrect document was filed at DE #5 Waiver of Service Executed and that they filed the correct document at DE #6 Waiver of Service Executed. (ECO)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristina Richardson (Answer due 6/15/2020). (Mezibov, Marc) Modified text on 6/3/2020 (ECO).
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 "INCORRECT" WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristina Richardson. Meggitt-USA, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Mezibov, Marc) (See DE #6 for correct entry). Modified on 6/3/2020 (ECO).
April 15, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS Service sent to Meggitt-USA, Inc. on 4/15/2020 by Kristina Richardson. Waiver of Service due by 6/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(ECO)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4646954), filed by Kristina Richardson. (Process-Request for Waiver) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Discrimination Notice of of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Meggitt-USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Richardson
Represented By: Marc D. Mezibov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meggitt-USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?