Singler v. B.B. Riverboats, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Singler
Defendant: B.B. Riverboats, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00070
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #6 Notice to Attorney, #5 Notice to Attorney. (SLG)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Singler. B.B. Riverboats, Inc. waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Lyon, Joseph)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY McKenna Harper by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. Mailed attorney notice, attorney data form and attorney admission packet. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission)(SLG)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Adam Q. Voyles by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. Mailed attorney notice, attorney data form and attorney packet. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission)(SLG)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings is required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010.(SLG)cc: COR
May 7, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLG)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B.B. Riverboats, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (SLG)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4664204), filed by James Singler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(SLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singler v. B.B. Riverboats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Singler
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lyon
Represented By: McKenna Harper
Represented By: Adam Q. Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.B. Riverboats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?