L.L. et al v. Ft. Thomas Independent Schools et al
Plaintiff: K.L., P.L. and L.L.
Defendant: Ft. Thomas Board of Education and Ft. Thomas Independent Schools
Case Number: 2:2020cv00072
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #6 Answer to Complaint (ECO)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Ft. Thomas Board of Education, Ft. Thomas Independent Schools.(Cassidy, Suzanne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by K.L., L.L., P.L. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Blankenship, Randy) Modified on 5/13/2020 (ECO).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: That plaintiff shall file redacted copies of the above documents within five (5) days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/12/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
May 11, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4666224), filed by L.L., P.L., K.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order of Appointment of Guardian, #2 Exhibit B-Request for Due Process Hearing, #3 Exhibit C-Hearing Officer's Decision and Order, #4 Exhibit D-Final Decision and Order)(ECO) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (ECO). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2020: #5 "Redacted" Ex. A- Order of Appointment of Guardian, #6 "Redacted" Ex. B-Request for Due Process Hearing, #7 "Redacted Ex. C-Hearing Officer's Decision and Order, #8 "Redacted" Ex. D-Final Decision, #9 Exhibit E-Lettr dated 1/302019, #10 Exhibit F-Fee Agreement) (Filed per QC DE #5 ). (ECO). Modified text on 5/13/2020 (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.L. et al v. Ft. Thomas Independent Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L.
Represented By: Randy J. Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.L.
Represented By: Randy J. Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.L.
Represented By: Randy J. Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft. Thomas Board of Education
Represented By: Suzanne Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft. Thomas Independent Schools
Represented By: Suzanne Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?