Bauer vs. Accelerated Courier, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Bauer
Defendant: Accelrated Courier, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00073
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #5 Notice to Attorney. (SLG)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Bauer. Accelrated Courier, Inc. waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Gray, Jonathan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Robb S. Stokar by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. Mailed attorney notice, attorney data form and attorney admission packet. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Form)(SLG)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1)Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(SLG)cc: COR
May 12, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLG)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accelrated Courier, Inc. ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (SLG)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4668031) filed by John Bauer.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons Accelerated Courier, Inc.)(SLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer vs. Accelerated Courier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelrated Courier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan D. Gray
Represented By: Robb S. Stokar
Represented By: Scott A. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?