Tate et al v. Coldiron Concessions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Tate and Melinda Tate
Defendant: Coldiron Productions, LLC, Coldiron Event Rentals, LLC, Coldiron Concessions, LLC, Coldiron Concessions, Inc. and Coldiron Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00104
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Richard Tate, Melinda Tate of Service (Braden, Roger)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by September 11, 2020. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. The parties shall timely exchange supplemental information as required by Rule 26(e). Supplementation is due within 30 days of discovery of new information or the need to supplement but shall occur no later than 30 daysprior to the discovery deadline. 2. The parties have indicated they are agreeable to mediation. If at any time the parties should desire a settlement conference, they are directed to contact Judge Atkins' Chambers to schedule the conference, via email at: atkins_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall have agreed-upon dates and times prior to contacting chambers. 3. This action is assigned for a telephonic mid-discovery conference on January13, 2021, at 1:30 p.m., and shall be ON THE RECORD, from PIKEVILLE. Counsel shall access the conference by calling AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-877-336-1839 (See Order for Details). 4. The parties shall file any motion to join parties or amend pleadings by October 8, 2020. 5. No later than March 31, 2021, counsel for the parties shall complete all pretrial fact and expert discovery. 6. Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2), no later than December 23, 2020, the plaintiff shalldisclose the identity of expert witnesses who may be used at trial, accompanied by written reports signed by the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B) expert witness and/or written summaries consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C), as applicable, all in compliance with the rule. The same is required by the defendant no later than February 8, 2021. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. 7. The parties shall have to and including June 23, 2021, by which to file all dispositive motions and Daubert motions, with response and reply time as per Local Rule 7.1(c). A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Judge Bertelsman's Chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing; said courtesy copy should be in paper form or emailed (in electronic format using Microsoft Word), to: bertelsman_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. 8. Requests to modify any dates or deadlines established by this order shall besubmitted upon motion filed prior to expiration of the deadline in question, and upon showing of good cause beyond the control of counsel in the exercise of due diligence. See L.R. 7.1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 9/9/2020.(ECO)cc: COR Modified on 9/9/2020 (ECO).
August 31, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Edward B. Atkins for review: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (ECO)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trombetta, Patricia)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: a. The discovery plan, containing, inter alia, the parties' views and proposals on all items Rule 26(f)(3) lists and any standard scheduling order deadlines and/or requirements on which the parties wish the Court to consider specific timing proposals;b. The parties' estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions;c. The parties' belief(s) as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution and any proposed timing; and d. The parties' estimate as to the likely length of trial and dates mutually convenient for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 8/14/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
August 14, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Edward B. Atkins for review: #6 Answer to Complaint (ECO)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coldiron Concessions, Inc.. (Trombetta, Patricia)
August 11, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #6 Answer to Complaint (ECO)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Patricia J. Trombetta. #6 Answer to Complaint has been filed by Coldiron Concessions, Inc., Coldiron Concessions, LLC, Coldiron Productions, LLC, Coldiron Event Rentals, LLC, Coldiron Enterprises, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Coldiron Concessions, Inc., Coldiron Concessions, LLC, Coldiron Enterprises, Inc., Coldiron Event Rentals, LLC, Coldiron Productions, LLC.(Trombetta, Patricia)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Coldiron Concessions, LLC, Coldiron Enterprises, Inc., Coldiron Event Rentals, LLC, Coldiron Productions, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State (2 attested copies of Complaint and certified mail receipt). (ECO)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coldiron Concessions, Inc. ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
July 21, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4728514), filed by Richard Tate, Melinda Tate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coldiron Concession, Inc., #3 Summons Coldiron Concession, LLC, #4 Summons Coldiron Enterprises, Inc., #5 Summons Coldiron Event Rentals, #6 Summons Coldiron Productions, LLC)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate et al v. Coldiron Concessions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldiron Productions, LLC
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldiron Event Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldiron Concessions, LLC
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldiron Concessions, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldiron Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tate
Represented By: Roger N. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Tate
Represented By: Roger N. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?