Cooper v. River Metals Recycling, LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Cooper
Defendant: River Metals Recycling, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00116
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: (1) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the Court regarding (a) whether they continue to dispute the amount in controversy and, if so, (b) whether they desire jurisdictional discovery and/or additional briefing. The parties shall also propose a briefing schedule if necessary; and(2) Plaintiff's deadline for responding to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6 ) and Motion to Strike (Doc. #7 ) is hereby extended and responses shall be due no later than thirty (30) days after the order adjudicating Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #8 ). Any reply by Defendant shall be filed fourteen (14) days thereafter. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/24/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
September 24, 2020 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK DELETING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD: The correct document is located on the docket at #14 The deleted document was entered on 09/24/2020. Document deleted because it was a Duplicate entry. cc: COR (KRB)
September 15, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard Cooper (TJZ)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to #8 in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Richard Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulations)(Parry, Ronald)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of his Motion to Remand #8 within seven (7) days from the date of entry of this Order; (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order #9 re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 and Motion to Strike #7 is granted. Plaintiff shall have an additional thirty (30) days to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 and Motion to Strike{7]. Any reply by Defendant shall be filed fourteen (14) days thereafter. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/8/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
September 5, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Scheduling Order re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by River Metals Recycling, LLC , #7 MOTION to Strike by River Metals Recycling, LLC Class Action Demand by Richard Cooper filed by River Metals Recycling, LLC. (Craig, Robert)
September 5, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard Cooper filed by River Metals Recycling, LLC. (Craig, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Scheduling Order re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by River Metals Recycling, LLC , #7 MOTION to Strike by River Metals Recycling, LLC Class Action Demand by Richard Cooper Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Parry, Ronald)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard Cooper (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand to Campbell Circuit Court, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ron Parry, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand to Campbell Circuit Court)(Parry, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike by River Metals Recycling, LLC Class Action Demand . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deed, #3 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert) Modified text to take out referral language on 8/28/2020 (ECO).
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by River Metals Recycling, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deed, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Eric Logsdon, #4 Proposed Order)(Craig, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by River Metals Recycling, LLC. (Craig, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Craig. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by River Metals Recycling, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00523. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4746538), filed by River Metals Recycling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Other State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Tiffany Reece Clark, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)
August 12, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. River Metals Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Metals Recycling, LLC
Represented By: Erica M. Spitzig
Represented By: Robert B. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cooper
Represented By: Ronald R. Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?