Westport Insurance Company v. City of Newport, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Company
Defendant: William Virgil, Norm Wagner, Sarah Desentz, Lt. Rick Sears, Lt. Col. Ken Page, Marc Brandt, Tom Fromme, Howard Neimeier, City of Newport, Kentucky, Robert Bradford and Pat Moore
Case Number: 2:2020cv00120
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: that Defendants motion for an extension of time #19 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant must file any response to #17 on or before October 23, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to stay [R. 18] is hereby GRANTED, pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/07/2020. (KRB)cc: COR
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 VIRTUAL ORDER: : granting #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Remand by Westport Insurance Company by William Virgil (UNOPPOSED). Defendant Virgil shall file his written response to Westports Motion for Remand not later than October 23, 2020 Responses due by 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/07/2020. (KRB)cc: COR
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Remand by Westport Insurance Company by William Virgil (UNOPPOSED) Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slosar, Elliot)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by Westport Insurance Company Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orberson, William)
September 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO William Orberson re #17 MOTION to Remand; Error: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit."Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment.Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (ECO)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand by Westport Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit-Answer to Complaint , #3 Proposed Order)(Orberson, William) Modified text to correctly describe attachment on 9/23/2020 (ECO).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) By 10/5/2020 parties shall meet to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: a) The discovery plan; b) Estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) Belief(s) as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of ADR and any proposed timing; d) Estimate as to the length of trial and dates mutually convenient for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 9/15-2020.(TJZ)cc: COR
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Bradford, Marc Brandt, City of Newport, Kentucky, Sarah Desentz, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Neimeier, Rick Sears, Norm Wagner. (Kuhlman, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting #9 MOTION for Leave to File by William Virgil Defendant's Amended Notice of Removal. cc: COR Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 09/11/2020. (SLG)cc: COR
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westport Insurance Company. (Orberson, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Orberson, William. #8 Stipulation has been filed by Westport Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KRB)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: that the Plaintiff shall file any response to the motion [R. 9] no later than TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 09/02/20.(KRB)cc: COR
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by William Virgil.(Slosar, Elliot)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File by William Virgil Defendant's Amended Notice of Removal Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order)(Slosar, Elliot)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION ON WESTPORT'S RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIMS by Westport Insurance Company. (Orberson, William)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: that the defendants motion #6 is GRANTED. Elliot Slossar of Loevy & Loevy shall be permitted to serve as pro hac vice counsel for the defendant in this matter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 08/27/2020. (KRB)cc: COR
August 27, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Elliot Slosar re #6 MOTION for Elliot Slosar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Virgil ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4759044). (KRB)
August 27, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: re #6 MOTION for Elliot Slosar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Virgil ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4759044) (KRB)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Elliot Slosar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Virgil ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4759044)Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Slosar, Elliot)
August 24, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Kanovitz on behalf of Robert Bradford, Marc Brandt, City of Newport, Kentucky, Sarah Desentz, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Neimeier, Ken Page, Rick Sears, William Virgil, Norm Wagner (ECO)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Robinson Staples on behalf of Robert Bradford, Marc Brandt, City of Newport, Kentucky, Sarah Desentz, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Neimeier, Ken Page, Rick Sears, William Virgil, Norm Wagner (ECO)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-489. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4756131), filed by Norm Wagner, Robert Bradford, William Virgil, Howard Neimeier, City of Newport, Kentucky, Marc Brandt, Sarah Desentz, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Ken Page, Rick Sears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Westport Complaint (State Court Record), #2 Exhibit 2-Service Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3-Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4-Notice of Removal to All Parties)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westport Insurance Company v. City of Newport, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Orberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Virgil
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Elliot Slosar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norm Wagner
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Desentz
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Rick Sears
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Col. Ken Page
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Brandt
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Fromme
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Neimeier
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newport, Kentucky
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bradford
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Moore
Represented By: Amy Robinson Staples
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Jason Charles Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?