Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Cintech Construction, Inc., TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. and Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00127
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Catherine Bednar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4822183)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion)(Miller, Barry)
October 26, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #9 Notice to Attorney Catherine A. Bednar. (ECO)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cintech Construction, Inc.. Cintech Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Manion, Andrew)
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Schmidt, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 21 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC. (Sparks, Robert)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #17 MOTION for James D. Houston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/18/2020. (TJZ)cc: COR
October 15, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #17 MOTION for James D. Houston to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4801174) (TJZ)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Sparks. #16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Corporex Development & Construction Management without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJZ)
October 15, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed re #17 MOTION for James D. Houston to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4801174). (TJZ)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC re #17 MOTION for James D. Houston to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4801174) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James D. Houston, Esq.)(Sparks, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for James D. Houston to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4801174)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James D. Houston, Esq.)(Sparks, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #2 proposed order) (TJZ).
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC. (Sparks, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #12 MOTION for Amanda M. Leffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/7/2020. (TJZ)cc: COR, Amanda M. Leffler via US Mail w/ECF Registration Form
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #11 MOTION for P. Wesley Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/7/2020. (TJZ)cc: COR, Wesley Lambert via US Mail w/ECF Registration Form
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC. (Sparks, Robert)
October 1, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #12 MOTION for Amanda M. Leffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4788992), #11 MOTION for Amanda M. Leffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4788976) (TJZ)
October 1, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed re #12 MOTION for Amanda M. Leffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4788992), #11 MOTION for Amanda M. Leffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4788976). (TJZ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Amanda M. Leffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4788992)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Schmidt, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for P. Wesley Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4788976)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit-Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Michael) Modified text on 9/30/2020 (TJZ).
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Waiver of Service, #2 Attachment Waiver of Service, #3 Attachment Waiver of Service)(Miller, Barry)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Catherine A. Bednar by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Form-No record found)(ECO)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 9/24/2020 properly alleging the citizenship of Defendant Corporex. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/14/2020.(TJZ)cc: COR
September 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Barry Miller re #6 Notice of Filing; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Summons." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (ECO)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cintech Construction, Inc., Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC, TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service via Secretary of State Packet (2 attested copies of Complaint (for each Defendant) and certified mail receipt). (ECO)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons-Corporex, #2 Summons-TP Mechanical, #3 Summons-Cintech)(Miller, Barry) Modified to correctly describe attachments on 9/11/2020 (ECO).
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Miller, Barry)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Barry Miller. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Barry Miller re #1 Complaint; attorney notifiedclerk the summons should be returned via Secretary of State Packet; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 20-99999. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance onpaper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with theprepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (ECO)
September 10, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4772216), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter dated 5/29/2020 with documents, #2 Exhibit B-Letter dated 7/7/2020, #3 Civil Cover Sheet -Corporex, #4 Civil Cover Sheet -Cintech, #5 Civil Cover Sheet -TP Mechanical)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintech Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TP Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Schmidt
Represented By: Phillip Wesley Lambert
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporex Development & Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Sparks
Represented By: James D. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine A. Bednar
Represented By: Barry M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?