Estes v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ryan P. Estes
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00138
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AGREED ORDER: Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company shall have until 12/8/2020 to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's amended complaint and to file its corporate disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/17/2020. (TJZ)cc: COR
November 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2020. (SLG)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Attorney G. David Rubin Pro Hac Vice #14 and the Motion to Admit Attorney Hayk Ghalumyan Pro Hac Vice #15 are hereby taken under advisement, pending counsel filing by not later than November 30, 2020, a supplement providing the necessary additional information.Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/17/2020. (SLG)cc: CORand G. David Rubin, Hayk Ghalumyan by US Mail
November 17, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #15 MOTION for Hayk Ghalumyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824811), #16 Proposed Agreed Order re Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by Cincinnati Insurance Company (KRB)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order re Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Cook, Matthew)
November 12, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #15 MOTION for Hayk Ghalumyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824811), #14 MOTION for G. David Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824810) (ECO)
November 12, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to G. David Rubin, Hayk Ghalumyan re #15 MOTION for Hayk Ghalumyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824811), #14 MOTION for G. David Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824810). (ECO)
November 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Hayk Ghalumyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824811)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Cook, Matthew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for G. David Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4824810)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Cook, Matthew)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan P. Estes via Secretary of State to Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (ECO) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (ECO).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER: that Defendant, Cincinnati InsuranceCompany, shall have through November 24, 2020, in which to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs amended complaint and to file its corporate disclosure statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/2/2020. (ECO)cc: COR
November 2, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #11 Proposed Agreed Order re Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by Cincinnati Insurance Company (ECO)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order re Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Cook, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Porter Cook on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Cook, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #9 Amended Complaint (ECO)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Insurance Company, filed by Ryan P. Estes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Policy)(Autry, Josh)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Ky Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued. (ECO)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ryan P. Estes. (Autry, Josh)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: That an Amended Complaint shall be filed within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, the same being on or before October 23, 2020, properly identifying the Plaintiff(s) in this matter and alleging the citizenship of the parties so as to demonstrate that the Court has diversity subject matter jurisdiction. Any attachments referenced in the Amended Complaint should also be filed contemporaneous with the filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/13/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Josh Autry. #1 Complaint has been filed by Ryan P. Estes D.M.D., M.S., P.S.C. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Insurance Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service via Secretary of State Packet (2 attested copies of Complaint and certified mail receipt). (ECO)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
September 30, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4788852), filed by Ryan P. Estes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cincinnati Insurance Company)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estes v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan P. Estes
Represented By: Josh Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Represented By: G. David Rubin
Represented By: Hayk Ghalumyan
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?